EP4004066 - SINGLE SITE CATALYSED MULTIMODAL POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABU DHABI POLYMERS CO. LTD (BOROUGE) LLC. Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P.O. Box 6925 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Raghvendra Borouge Pte Ltd Abu Dhabi Branch Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P. O. Box 6925, Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | 02 /
ABU FOUL, Tariq Hashim Borouge Pte Ltd Abu Dhabi Branch Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P. O. Box 6925, Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | 03 /
VERMA, Pankaj Borouge Pte Ltd Abu Dhabi Branch Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P. O. Box 6925, Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | 04 /
BANDYOPADHYAY, Pratyush Flat No. 1102, Ram Laxman Tower, Sector 18, Vashi, Navi Mumbai Maharashtra 400705 / IN | 05 /
DIXIT, Niraj Borouge (India) Pvt Ltd 1501/1502 B Wing Lotus Corporate Park W.E Highway, Goregaon (E) Mumbai 400063 / IN | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20737457.0 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP69282 | Priority number, date | EP20190187632 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19187632 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013552 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004066 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08L23/08, C08F4/659 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,CN,KR);
C08F210/08 (KR);
C08J5/18 (CN);
C08L23/06 (KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F4/65916 (EP);
C08J2323/08 (CN);
C08J2423/06 (CN);
C08L2203/16 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (CN,KR);
C08L2205/03 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L2207/066 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/001 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/27 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6492 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925 (CN,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L23/0815, C08L23/06 (EP,CN);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/22, C08F2500/26, C08F2500/27 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | SINGLE-SITE-KATALYSIERTE MULTIMODALE POLYETHYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/22] | English: | SINGLE SITE CATALYSED MULTIMODAL POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITION | [2022/22] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE MULTIMODAL CATALYSÉ EN UN SEUL SITE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 21.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9935652 (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY [FI], et al); | [XI]WO0040620 (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY [FI], et al); | [X]EP3331950 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) | by applicant | US3242150 | US3324093 | US3374211 | US3405109 | US4532311 | US4543399 | US4578879 | US4582816 | EP0188125 | US4621952 | EP0250169 | US4803251 | US4855370 | US4933149 | US5026795 | EP0479186 | EP0560035 | EP0579426 | EP0600414 | WO9425495 | US5391654 | WO9512622 | EP0684871 | EP0696293 | EP0699213 | EP0707513 | EP0721798 | WO9632423 | WO9728170 | WO9832776 | EP0891990 | WO9935652 | WO9961489 | WO0029452 | WO0040620 | WO03010208 | EP1310295 | WO03051934 | WO03051514 | EP1415999 | WO2004085499 | WO2005087261 | EP1591460 | EP1739103 | EP1752462 | WO2007025640 | WO2016083208 | EP3331950 |