EP3973149 - TURBINE FOR A TURBOMACHINE, FOR EXAMPLE AN AIRCRAFT TURBOREACTOR OR TURBOPROP ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/13] | TURBINE FOR A TURBOMACHINE, SUCH AS AN AEROPLANE TURBOFAN OR TURBOPROP ENGINE | ||
[2022/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNAU, Rémy, Miled, Michel SAFRAN CEPI Rond-point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
GENILIER, Arnaud, Lasantha SAFRAN CEPI Rond-point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
CONTINI, Nicolas SAFRAN CEPI Rond-point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
GOOSSENS, Maria SAFRAN CEPI Rond-point René Ravaud Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 05 /
SILET, Benoit, Guillaume SAFRAN CEPI Rond-point René Ravaud - Réau 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20737518.9 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020FR50834 | Priority number, date | FR20190005340 | 21.05.2019 Original published format: FR 1905340 | [2022/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234542 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973149 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3973149 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/24 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F05D2260/231 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINE FÜR EINE TURBOMASCHINE, WIE ZUM BEISPIEL EIN TURBOSTRAHLTRIEBWERK ODER EIN TURBOPROPTRIEBWERK FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | [2022/40] | English: | TURBINE FOR A TURBOMACHINE, FOR EXAMPLE AN AIRCRAFT TURBOREACTOR OR TURBOPROP ENGINE | [2022/40] | French: | TURBINE POUR UNE TURBOMACHINE, TELLE QU'UN TURBORÉACTEUR OU UN TURBOPROPULSEUR D'AVION | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/13] | TURBINE FÜR EINE TURBOMASCHINE, WIE EIN MANTELSTROMTRIEBWERK ODER TURBOPROPTRIEBWERK EINES FLUGZEUGS | ||
Former [2022/13] | TURBINE FOR A TURBOMACHINE, SUCH AS AN AEROPLANE TURBOFAN OR TURBOPROP ENGINE | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 23.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | IE | 19.05.2023 | LU | 19.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 19.05.2023 | ||
LU | 19.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 19.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 19.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 19.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1533478 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009246012 (SHAPIRO JASON DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0022] *; | [A]FR2961556 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 27; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP3078814 (IHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026]; figure 2 *; | [A]FR3061741 (SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES [FR]) [A] 1-9* page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 2; figure 2 * |