EP3993897 - ALKALI -BASED REMOVAL OF 002 FROM GAS STREAMS WITH CO-GENERATION OF CHEMICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 8 Rivers Capital, LLC 406 Blackwell Street Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Xijia 3708 Kilgo Drive Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | 02 /
FORREST, Brock Alan 4129 Deep Wood Circle Durham, North Carolina 27707 / US | 03 /
PALMER, Miles R. 203 Hogan Woods Circle Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20737587.4 | 02.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020IB56273 | Priority number, date | US201962870187P | 03.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962870187 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001787 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993897 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/62, B01D53/73, B01D53/96, C25B1/04, C25B1/16, C25B1/26, C25B1/34, C01B7/01 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B01D53/62 (EP,KR);
B01D53/75 (KR,US);
B01D53/73 (EP,KR);
B01D53/78 (KR,US);
B01D53/965 (EP,KR,US);
C01B7/012 (EP,KR);
C10G2/50 (EP,KR);
C25B1/46 (EP,KR);
C25B15/08 (EP,KR);
F25J3/0266 (KR,US);
B01D2251/108 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/304 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/502 (EP,KR);
B01D2251/604 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,KR);
B01D2258/06 (EP);
B01D2259/124 (EP,KR);
F25J2205/40 (KR,US);
F25J2205/82 (KR,US);
F25J2210/80 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | ALKALIBASIERTE ENTFERNUNG VON 002 AUS GASSTRÖMEN MIT CO-ERZEUGUNG VON CHEMIKALIEN | [2022/19] | English: | ALKALI -BASED REMOVAL OF 002 FROM GAS STREAMS WITH CO-GENERATION OF CHEMICALS | [2022/19] | French: | ÉLIMINATION À BASE D'ALCALI DE 002 À PARTIR DE FLUX DE GAZ AVEC COGÉNÉRATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 01.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4069117 (COOPER HAL B H) [X] 11,13-16,21,22 * column 1, lines 30-60; figure 1 * * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 13 * [I] 1-10,12,17-21,23,24; | [A]JP2004174369 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2009039445 (SKYONIC CORP [US], et al) [X] 11 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,7 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 24, paragraph 2 * * page 37, paragraph 7 - page 38, paragraph 1 * [I] 1-10,12-24; | [XI]US2010137457 (KAPLAN THOMAS PROGER [US]) [X] 11-14,19,21 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0011] - [0014] - [0016] - [0018] - [0020]; claims 1,2,4,6-9,17 * [I] 1-10,15-18,20,22-24; | [XI]WO2011088515 (DYSART PROPRIETARY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 11-14,21,22 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 5; figure 1 * * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 2 * [I] 1-10,15-20,23,24; | [A]WO2015109190 (SKYONIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-24* paragraphs [0030] , [0035] , [0039] , [0040] , [0045] - [0047] - [0068] , [0069] , [0078]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | - HUSKINSON et al., "A high power density, high efficiency hydrogen-chlorine regenerative fuel cell with a low precious metal content catalyst", Energy and Environmental Science, (20120600), vol. 5, no. 9 |