EP3897049 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING OR RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK IN UNLICENSED BAND, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Hyunsoo IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Sukhyon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seonwook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Youngsub IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 20738146.8 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/42] | WO2020KR00525 | Priority number, date | US201962791609P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791609 P | KR20190018247 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190018247 | US201962842592P | 03.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842592 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145751 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897049 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3897049 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W48/08, H04J11/00, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04L5/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W56/00 (KR,US);
H04W74/0808 (KR,US);
H04J11/0069 (EP,KR,US);
H04J11/0073 (EP);
H04J11/0076 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W48/08 (KR,US);
H04W56/0015 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H04W56/00, H04W48/08, H04J11/00, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN ODER EMPFANGEN EINES SYNCHRONISATIONSSIGNALBLOCKS IN EINEM UNLIZENZIERTEN BAND UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING OR RECEIVING SYNCHRONIZATION SIGNAL BLOCK IN UNLICENSED BAND, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION OU DE RÉCEPTION DE BLOC DE SIGNAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION DANS UNE BANDE SANS LICENCE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | Translation filed | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | IE | 10.01.2023 | LU | 10.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
IT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.01.2023 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 10.01.2023 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017134960 (ZHANG XIAOBO [CN]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0121] * * paragraphs [0130] - [0199]; figures 1-4 *; | [X] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Initial access and mobility for NR unlicensed operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1812561, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1812561%2Ezip, (20181111), XP051554506 [X] 1-15 * pages 1-17 * | [X] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Enhancements to NR DL signals and channels for unlicensed operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1812480 INTEL NRU DL SIGNALS AND CHANNELS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1812480%2Ezip, (20181111), XP051554424 [X] 1-15 * pages 1-12 * | International search | [A]WO2017035238 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0044]-[0049], [0089]; and claim 6. *; | [Y]KR20180069002 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1, 7-8, 14-15 * See paragraphs [0064]-[0069]; claim 6; and figure 9. *; | [A]US2018302182 (LY HUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0062J, [0071]-[0073]; and claims 1, 11. *; | [YA]KR20180135871 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1, 7-8, 14-15 * See paragraphs [0244]-[0258]; and claims 1, 5, 8. * [A] 2-6, 9-13; | [A]KR20180137419 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0181]-[0194]; and claim 1. * |