EP3910893 - METHOD FOR SUPPORTING QUALITY OF SERVICE OF TIME-SENSITIVE COMMUNICATION AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KE, Xiaowan 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yanxia 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
KE, Xiaowan Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Yanxia Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20738273.0 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020CN71505 | Priority number, date | CN20191028865 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910028865 | [2021/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143788 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910893 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/80, H04L47/2491, // H04L47/2416, H04W28/02 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L47/2491 (EP);
H04L47/28 (EP);
H04L5/0058 (CN,KR);
H04L5/0078 (CN,KR);
H04L47/2416 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H04L12/853, H04W28/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER DIENSTGÜTE EINER ZEITSENSITIVEN KOMMUNIKATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/46] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPORTING QUALITY OF SERVICE OF TIME-SENSITIVE COMMUNICATION AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SUPPORT D'UNE QUALITÉ DE SERVICE D'UNE COMMUNICATION SENSIBLE AU TEMPS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2021 | Translation filed | 22.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2018015425 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]); | [A]US2018035392 (PATEL DEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2018237040 (MONG TAB ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]CN108809852 (GEN ELECTRIC) |