EP3919052 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR INTRAOCULAR OR ORAL ADMINISTRATION FOR TREATMENT OF RETINAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuso Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 7-10 Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states Yamada, Ken-Ichi 1-1, Maidashi 3-chome Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | [2021/51] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Fuso Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 7-10 Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINTO, Saki 1-1, Maidashi 3-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Minato 1-1, Maidashi 3-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Keiichi c/o Research and Development Center of FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., 3-30, Morinomiya 2-chome, Joto-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8523 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Ken-ichi 1-1, Maidashi 3-chome, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
SHINTO, Saki Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIDA, Minato Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAMOTO, Keiichi Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-8523 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMADA, Ken-ichi Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8582 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20739000.6 | 09.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP00538 | Priority number, date | JP20190001979 | 09.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019001979 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145364 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919052 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K31/403, A61K31/407, A61K31/47, A61P27/02, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/20, A61K31/4045, A61K31/4439 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/245 (EP);
A61K31/404 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (EP);
A61K31/407 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K31/473 (EP);
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/06 (EP);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/10 (EP);
A61K9/1605 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61K9/2059 (EP);
A61K9/2077 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | A61K31/137, A61K31/403, A61K31/407, A61K31/47, A61P27/02, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR INTRAOKULAREN ODER ORALEN VERABREICHUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RETINAERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/49] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR INTRAOCULAR OR ORAL ADMINISTRATION FOR TREATMENT OF RETINAL DISEASES | [2021/49] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR ADMINISTRATION INTRAOCULAIRE OU ORALE EN VUE DU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES RÉTINIENNES | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | Translation filed | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005137147 (LANDERS ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 12] , [0 49] - [0052]; claims 1,8 * [Y] 8; | [XY]US2011251230 (SHAW PAMELA [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraph [0023]; claims 8,10 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]WO2015029948 (LINK GENOMICS INC [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * figure 6; example 1; claim - * [Y] 8,9; | [XYI]US9018202 (KUSARI JYOTIRMOY [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-13 * column 2 lines 14-29, column 11 lines 21-25, lines 43-55;; figure -; example -; claim - * [Y] 9 [I] 7,10; | [Y]US2018161407 (BORODIC GARY E [US]) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0071] , [0082]; claims 5,8 * | International search | [X]JP2007515422 [X] 1-13 * 1 1, [0006] ,[0007], [0016] , [0029] *; | [X]JP2012506410 [X] 1-13 * 1, 3, [0025] *; | [X]WO2015029948 (LINK GENOMICS INC [JP]) [X] 1-13 * 1 , 2,4, [0005], [0006], [0030] *; | [PX]WO2019009355 (YAMADA KEN ICHI [JP], et al) [P] 1-13[X] | by applicant | JP2011520788 | - ACAR, N. et al., PLosS. One, (20120000), vol. 7, page 35102 | - YE.X. et al., Trends. Mol. Med., (20100000), vol. 16, pages 417 - 25 | - TANITO M. et al., Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. SCI., (20070000), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 1900 - 5 | WO2018JP25496 |