EP3905574 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Di Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Kunpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
ZHANG, Di Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Kunpeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20739065.9 | 10.01.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020CN71526 | Priority number, date | CN20191028826 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910028826 | CN201911215742 | 02.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911215742 | [2021/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143801 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905574 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/44] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | Translation filed | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Draft CR on TS38.213 on CORESET 0", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181114), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1814052 DRAFT CR ON 213 CORESET0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F95/Docs/R1%2D1814052%2Ezip, (20181114), XP051494503 [I] 1-15 * pages 1,2,4,5 * | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Further details on beam indication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171117), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1719806, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F91/Docs/, (20171117), XP051369186 [I] 1-15 * pages 4, 5 * * page 8 * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]CN108199819 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-52 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018128351 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-52* entire document *; | [A]CN109150272 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-52 * entire document *; | [X] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "Draft CR on TS38.214 on CORESET 0", 3GPP TSG-RAN1 Meeting #95 R1-1814052, (20181116), doi:20200329171850X, XP051494503 [X] 1-52 * pages 1, 2, 4 and 5 * | by applicant | CN20191028826 |