EP3909196 - ONE-TIME PADS ENCRYPTION HUB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defender Cyber Technologies Ltd. 80 King George Street 6433805 Tel Aviv / IL | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLOMON, Maria 173 Hairit Street 4482000 Barqan / IL | 02 /
SOLOMON, Doron 173 Hairit Street 4482000 Barqan / IL | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SOLOMON, Maria 4482000 Barqan / IL | ||
02 /
SOLOMON, Doron 4482000 Barqan / IL | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20739206.9 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/46] | WO2020IL50030 | Priority number, date | US201962789636P | 08.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962789636 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020144684 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909196 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909196 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/06, G06F21/60, G06F21/85, H04L9/40, H04L9/32 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP,IL,US);
H04L63/0471 (US);
G06F21/85 (EP,IL);
H04L63/0428 (EP,IL);
H04L63/067 (EP,IL);
H04L9/0656 (EP,IL,US);
H04L2209/76 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H04L9/06, H04L29/06, G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKVERTEILER FÜR EINMALSCHLÜSSEL-VERFAHREN | [2023/31] | English: | ONE-TIME PADS ENCRYPTION HUB | [2021/46] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR DE CHIFFREMENT À MASQUE JETABLE | [2021/46] |
Former [2021/46] | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSZENTRALE FÜR EINMALIGE PADS | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8160243 (BEAN REGINALD D [US]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 9 *; | [X]US2014337615 (TOMKOW TERRANCE A [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0168] *; | [A]US2018063096 (ROGSON ARIEL SHAI [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0098] * | International search | [Y]US2002164026 (HUIMA ANTTI [FI]) [Y] 6,16,26 * the whole doc. *; | [A]US2009327703 (FEUDO CHRISTOPHER V [US], et al) [A] 1-50* the whole doc. *; | [XY]US2014337615 (TOMKOW TERRANCE A [US]) [X] 1-3,5,11-13,15,21-23,25,31,38,45 * the whole doc. the whole doc. * [Y] 4,6-10,14,16-20,24,26-30,32-37,39-44,46-50; | [X]US2018063096 (ROGSON ARIEL SHAI [US]) [X] 1,11,21,31,38,45 * the whole doc. *; | [Y] - DULIGALL JL et al., "Low cost and compact quantum key distribution", New Journal of Physics, vol. 8, no. 10, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/8/10/249, (20061024), page 249, URL: https://iopscience.iop.org/article/10.1088/1367-2630/8/10/249/meta, XP020107565 [Y] 8,9,18,19,28,29,36,37,43,44,49,50 * the whole doc. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/8/10/249 | by applicant | US2014337615 |