EP3999918 - GLAZING SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIGNON, Maxime rue Mont Coupé N°57 7070 Gottignies / BE | 02 /
ISERENTANT, Arnaud Rue Louis Taburiau, 22 1472 Vieux-Genappe / BE | 03 /
AYOUB, Patrick Rue de Bonne Espérance, 2 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Rue Louis Blériot 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20739397.6 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP70089 | Priority number, date | EP20190187269 | 19.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19187269 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013673 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999918 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP);
G01H1/00 (CN);
G01M5/0066 (US);
G06N20/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERGLASUNGSSENSOR | [2022/21] | English: | GLAZING SENSOR | [2022/21] | French: | CAPTEUR DE VITRAGE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 21.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2016250997 (TODA KENTARO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9,13 * paragraph [0006]; figures 2,4-6 * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 10-12 [I] 5,14,15; | [A]CN208672139U (SHENYANG GUSHAN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XDYI]WO2019101884 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE]) [XD] 1-7,9,13 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 5 * * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 16; figure 1 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 14,15 | by applicant | WO2019101884 |