EP3913988 - TERMINAL ENERGY-SAVING METHOD, BASE STATION, TERMINAL, TERMINAL ENERGY-SAVING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHA, Xiubin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Ting ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Xu ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
SHA, Xiubin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
DAI, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
LU, Ting Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
04 /
LIU, Xu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Aipex B.V. Vestdijk 51 5611 CA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Aipex B.V. P.O. Box 30223 3001 DE Rotterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 20740993.9 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN71684 | Priority number, date | CN20191049747 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910049747 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020147669 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913988 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W68/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W52/0235 (US);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0248 (CN,KR);
H04W52/028 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPARVERFAHREN FÜR ENDGERÄT, BASISSTATION, ENDGERÄT, ENERGIESPARSYSTEM FÜR ENDGERÄT UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/47] | English: | TERMINAL ENERGY-SAVING METHOD, BASE STATION, TERMINAL, TERMINAL ENERGY-SAVING SYSTEM AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DE TERMINAL, STATION DE BASE, TERMINAL, SYSTÈME D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DE TERMINAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | Translation filed | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017339640 (KRISHNAMOORTHY PARTHASARATHY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0074] , [0079] - [0093] - [0113] - [0124]; figures 7,8,12 * [I] 4-6,8; | [XI]WO2018063467 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10-12 * paragraphs [0024] , [0069] , [0070] , [0076] , [0089] * [I] 2-6,9; | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Combining RRC-INACTIVE and 5G UP optimization for efficient handling of bursty frequent small data", vol. SA WG2, no. Vilnius, Lithuania; 20180702 - 20180706, (20180706), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-187276_WAS_S2-187214_WAS_S2-186435-23724_COMBINED_RRC_INACTIVE_CONNECTED AND RRC_INACTIVE_IDLE_FOR_FREQ_SMALL_DATA_V1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F128%5FVilnius/Docs/S2%2D187276%2Ezip, (20180706), XP051502840 [A] 1-12 * Sections 1 and 2 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Cellular IoT support and evolution for the 5G System (Release 16)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL REPORT; 3GPP TR 23.724, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20181207), vol. SA WG2, no. V2.0.0, pages 1 - 276, XP051591078 [A] 1-12 * Section 6.22 * | International search | [A]WO2012053841 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-21* entire document *; | [X]CN107113716 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [X] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0043] to [0081], and figures 1-6 *; | [X]CN107637142 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC) [X] 1-21 * claims 1-20, and description, paragraphs [0138] *; | [PX]CN110536383 (ZTE CORP) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-21 * | by applicant | CN20191049747 |