EP3911258 - EFFICIENT MULTI-FUNCTIONAL ENDOSCOPIC INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPG Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, Massachusetts 01540 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTSHULER, Gregory 17 Cerulean Way Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | 02 /
YAROSLAVSKY, Ilya 54 Lancaster Road N. An dover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | 03 /
BOUTOUSSOV, Dmitri 1200 Madison Place, Apt 534 Southborough, Massachusetts 01772 / US | 04 /
ANDREEVA, Viktoriya 2 Shelkovsky proezd Dom 5, korpus 2, kv.24 Mytishchi, Moscow Region, 141006 / RU | 05 /
KOVALENKO, Anastasiya 2nd Shchelkovsky passage, house 5 building 2, apartment 45 Mytishchi, Moscow region, 141006 / RU | 06 /
TRAXER, Olivier 63 rue des Haies 75020 Paris / FR | 07 /
BARENBOYM, Michael 601 Tremont St., Suite 4 Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | 08 /
OSTROVSKY, Isaac 5 Willow Street Wellesley, Massachusetts 02481 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
ALTSHULER, Gregory Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | ||
02 /
YAROSLAVSKY, Ilya dover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | |||
03 /
BOUTOUSSOV, Dmitri Southborough, Massachusetts 01772 / US | |||
04 /
ANDREEVA, Viktoriya Mytishchi, Moscow Region, 141006 / RU | |||
05 /
KOVALENKO, Anastasiya Mytishchi, Moscow region, 141006 / RU | |||
06 /
TRAXER, Olivier 75020 Paris / FR | |||
07 /
BARENBOYM, Michael Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | |||
08 /
OSTROVSKY, Isaac Wellesley, Massachusetts 02481 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20741363.4 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020US14293 | Priority number, date | US201962794328P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794328 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020150713 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3911258 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M25/00, G05G1/10 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61B18/26 (EP,US);
A61B1/00091 (EP,US);
A61B1/00094 (EP);
A61B1/00096 (US);
A61B1/00097 (US);
A61B1/00137 (EP);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (EP);
A61B1/0684 (US);
A61B1/07 (US);
A61B1/307 (US);
A61B2018/00035 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00166 (EP);
A61B2018/00321 (EP);
A61B2018/00482 (EP);
A61B2018/00511 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00517 (EP);
A61B2018/00547 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP);
A61B2018/00744 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00863 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00982 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2211 (EP);
A61B2018/2222 (EP);
A61B2018/225 (EP);
A61B2018/263 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/306 (EP);
A61B2218/002 (EP,US);
A61B2218/007 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | A61B17/94, A61B1/002, A61B1/04, A61B1/06, A61B1/015, A61B1/018, A61B1/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES MULTIFUNKTIONELLES ENDOSKOPISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2021/47] | English: | EFFICIENT MULTI-FUNCTIONAL ENDOSCOPIC INSTRUMENT | [2021/47] | French: | INSTRUMENT ENDOSCOPIQUE MULTIFONCTIONNEL EFFICACE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005197530 (WALLACE DANIEL T [US], et al); | [X]US2012209074 (TITUS JAMES SIDNEY [US]); | [X]US2014163317 (SIGMON JR JOHN C [US], et al); | [Y]US2016038007 (BINMOELLER KENNETH F [US], et al); | [XYI]US2017231477 (DEL NIDO PEDRO J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2003130575 (DESAI ASHVIN [US]); | [XY]US2008188868 (WEITZNER BARRY [US], et al); | [Y]US2014213848 (MOSKOWITZ MOSHEH T [US], et al) |