EP3913993 - POWER CONTROL METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yumin 283, BBK Road,Wusha,Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
WU, Yumin Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20741407.9 | 08.01.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN70896 | Priority number, date | CN20191056539 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910056539 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020147626 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913993 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/14, // H04W8/18, H04W8/26, H04W52/36, H04W52/28, H04W60/00, H04W88/06 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/281 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/18 (CN);
H04W52/28 (CN);
H04W52/30 (CN);
H04W52/34 (KR);
H04W52/365 (EP,KR);
H04W52/367 (EP);
H04W60/005 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | H04W52/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/47] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2021 | Translation filed | 10.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018063200 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1,2,9,10 *; | [X]EP3340732 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for control (Release 15)", (20190116), 3GPP DRAFT; 38213-F40, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/3guInternal/3GPP%5Fultimate%5Fversions%5Fto%5Fbe%5Ftransposed/sentToDpc/38213%2Df40%2Ezip, (20190116), XP051686991 [A] 1-15 * paragraph 7.5 * * paragraph 7.6 * * paragraph 7.7 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 15)", (20190113), 3GPP DRAFT; 36321-F40, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/3guInternal/3GPP%5Fultimate%5Fversions%5Fto%5Fbe%5Ftransposed/sentToDpc/36321%2Df40%2Ezip, (20190113), XP051686906 [A] 1-15 * paragraph 5.4.6 * * paragraph 6.1.3.6 * * paragraph 6.1.3.6a * * paragraph 6.1.3.6b * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 15)", (20190111), 3GPP DRAFT; 38321-F40, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/3guInternal/3GPP%5Fultimate%5Fversions%5Fto%5Fbe%5Ftransposed/sentToDpc/38321%2Df40%2Ezip, (20190111), XP051687001 [A] 1-15 * paragraph 5.4.6 * | International search | [A]CN102348269 (TELECOM SCI & TECHNOLOGY INST) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN102932892 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-32* entire document *; | [A]US2015373651 (RYU HYUN-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [X]CN105580451 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0025]-[0316], and figures 1-16 *; | [X]CN106686712 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [X] 1, 18, 20, 28-32 * description, paragraphs [0059]-[0219], and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN108632891 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [X]CN109155659 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC) [X] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0026]-[0337], and figures 1-7F * |