EP3881282 - DETECTING SENSOR OCCLUSION WITH COMPRESSED IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waymo LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Ruffin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Chettle, John Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20742015.9 | 13.01.2020 | [2021/38] | WO2020US13293 | Priority number, date | US201916248096 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: US201916248096 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020150127 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881282 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G06T7/00, H04N5/217, H04N5/225 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G01S7/497 (EP,IL,US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
G01S13/88 (IL,US);
G01S17/88 (IL,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,IL);
G06T1/0007 (KR);
G06T1/20 (KR);
G06T7/0002 (IL,US);
G06T9/00 (KR);
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/80 (EP,IL,KR,US);
H04N23/811 (EP);
H04N23/90 (US);
G01S2007/4975 (EP);
G01S2007/4977 (EP);
G06T2207/30168 (IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06T7/00, G06T1/20, G06T1/00, G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG DER OKKLUSION EINES SENSORS MIT KOMPRIMIERTEN BILDDATEN | [2021/38] | English: | DETECTING SENSOR OCCLUSION WITH COMPRESSED IMAGE DATA | [2021/38] | French: | DÉTECTION D'OCCLUSION DE CAPTEUR AVEC DES DONNÉES D'IMAGE COMPRESSÉES | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 02.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015163400 (GEISS RYAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017193641 (CHENG VICTOR [US]) | International search | [Y]WO2014165472 (GOOGLE INC [US]); | [Y]JP2015126441 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [Y]US2017193641 (CHENG VICTOR [US]); | [A]US2018160071 (AHN JONG-HOON [US], et al); | [A]US2018174306 (EDPALM VIKTOR [SE], et al) |