EP3990232 - METHOD FOR SPECIFYING AN INPUT VALUE ON A ROBOTIC MANIPULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franka Emika GmbH Frei-Otto-Str. 20 80797 München / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states Franka Emika GmbH Frei-Otto-Str. 20 80797 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENNINGER, Andreas Schwarzhölzlstr. 14A 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | 02 /
GOLZ, Saskia Birketweg 37 80639 München / DE | 03 /
PARUSEL, Sven Agnes-Bernauer-Str. 191 80687 München / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/18] | Rösler Rasch van der Heide & Partner Bodenseestraße 18 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20742655.2 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP67984 | Priority number, date | DE201910117217 | 26.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019117217 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020260556 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990232 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3990232 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, B25J13/02, G06F3/0481, G06F3/04847, G05B19/423 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B25J13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/1671 (CN);
B25J9/161 (CN);
G05B19/423 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04847 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | B25J9/16, B25J13/02, G05B19/423 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORGEBEN EINES EINGABEWERTS AN EINEM ROBOTERMANIPULATOR | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR SPECIFYING AN INPUT VALUE ON A ROBOTIC MANIPULATOR | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR SPÉCIFIER UNE VALEUR D'ENTRÉE SUR UN MANIPULATEUR ROBOTISÉ | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 20.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2013255426 (KASSOW KRISTIAN [DK], et al); | [A]WO2014005607 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2015130794 (KATSUDA SHINICHI [JP]); | [Y]WO2018049448 (KEBA AG [AT]); | [A]US2018235724 (NOWATSCHIN STEPHAN [DE], et al) |