EP4003291 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING VISCOSIFYING POLYMERS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ProQR Therapeutics II B.V. Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATENBURG, Gerardus Johannes Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | 02 /
VAN MIERLO, Elisabeth Laurentina Wilhelmina Maria Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | 03 /
YILMAZ-ELIS, Aliye Seda Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20743148.7 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP70897 | Priority number, date | EP20190188681 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19188681 | EP20190198642 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19198642 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021018750 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003291 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K38/00, A61K9/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/38 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VISKOSITÄTSERHÖHENDEN POLYMEREN UND NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2022/22] | English: | OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING VISCOSIFYING POLYMERS AND NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2022/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS OPHTALMIQUES COMPRENANT DES POLYMÈRES VISCOSIFIANTS ET DES ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.10.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/21] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9424983 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-7 * * figure 5 *; | [X]EP1625851 (BBK BIO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11* paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0213] *; | [X]WO2014025792 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-27 *; | [X] - BOCHOT A ET AL, "Comparison of the ocular distribution of a model oligonucleotide after topical instillation in rabbits of conventional and new dosage forms", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, GB, (19980101), vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 1061-186X, pages 309 - 313, XP008126963 [X] 1-17 * page 310, column l, line 1 - page 310, column l, line 63 * | by applicant | WO2004108945 | US2009163432 | EP2049664 | WO2011140194 | WO2012136969 | WO2014025792 | WO2014039012 | WO2016005514 | EP2526923 | WO2017060317 | WO2017186739 | WO2018055134 | - MOISEEV et al., "Penetration enhancers in ocular drug delivery", Pharmaceutics, (20190000), vol. 11, page 321 | - BOCHOT et al., "Comparison of the ocular distribution of a model oligonucleotide after topical instillation in rabbits of conventional and new dosage forms", J Drug Targeting, (19980000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 309 - 313, XP008126963 | - JOHNSON LN. et al., "Cell-penetrating peptide for enhanced delivery of nucleic acids and drugs to ocular tissues including retina and cornea", Mol Ther, (20180000), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1038/SJ.MT.6300324, pages 107 - 114, XP002521463 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.MT.6300324 | - LUDWIG A, "The use of mucoadhesive polymers in ocular drug delivery", Adv Drug Del Rev, (20050000), vol. 57, doi:10.1016/j.addr.2005.07.005, pages 1595 - 1639, XP025284002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2005.07.005 | - BARATZ KH et al., "E2-2 protein and Fuch's corneal dystrophy", N Engl J Med, (20100000), vol. 363, pages 1016 - 1024 | - SUNDIN OH et al., "A common locus for late onset Fuchs corneal dystrophy maps to 18q21.2-q21.32", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci, (20060000), vol. 47, pages 3919 - 3926 | - WIEBEN ED et al., "A common trinucleotide repeat expansion within the transcription 4 (TCF4, E2-2) gene predicts Fuchs corneal dystrophy", PLoS One, (20120000), vol. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0049083, page e49083, XP055075341 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0049083 | - WIEBEN ED et al., "Comprehensive assessment of genetic variants within TCF4 in Fuchs' endothelial corneal dystrophy", Invest Ophtalmol Vis Sci, (20140000), vol. 55, pages 6101 - 6107 | - MOOTHA VV et al., "Association and familial segregation of CTG18.1 trinucleotide expansion of TCF4 gene in Fuchs' endothelial corneal dystrophy", Invest Ophtalmol Vis Sci, (20140000), vol. 55, pages 32 - 42 | - STAMLER JF et al., "Confirmation of the association between the TCF4 risk allele and Fuchs endothelial corneal dystrophy in patients from the Midwestern United States", Ophthalmic Genet., (20130000), vol. 34, no. 1-2, pages 32 - 4 | - KUOT A et al., "Association of TCF4 and CLU polymorphisms with Fuchs' endothelial dystrophy and implication of CLU and TGFBI proteins in the disease process", Eur J Hum Genet., (20120000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 632 - 8 | - THALAMUTHU A et al., "Association of TCF4 gene polymorphisms with Fuchs' corneal dystrophy in the Chinese", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci., (20110000), vol. 52, no. 8, pages 5573 - 8 | - XING C et al., "Transethnic replication of association of CTG18.1 repeat expansion of TCF4 gene with Fuchs' corneal dystrophy in Chinese implies common causal variant", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci., (20140000), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 7073 - 8 | - NANDA GG et al., "Genetic association of TCF4 intronic polymorphisms, CTG18.1 and rs17089887, with Fuchs' endothelial corneal dystrophy in an Indian population", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci., (20140000), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 7674 - 80 | - DU et al., "RNA toxicity and missplicing in the common eye disease Fuch's endothelial corneal dystrophy", J Biol Chem, (20150000), vol. 290, no. 10, doi:10.1074/jbc.M114.621607, pages 5979 - 90, XP055328238 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M114.621607 | - MULDERS et al., "Triplet-repeat oligonucleotide-mediated reversal of RNA toxicity in myotonic dystrophy", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20090000), vol. 106, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.0905780106, pages 13915 - 20, XP055007026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0905780106 | - WINCHESTER CL et al., "Characterization of the expression of DMPK and SIX5 in the human eye and implications of pathogenesis in myotonic dystrophy", Hum Mol Genet., (19990000), vol. 8, pages 481 - 492 | - GATTEY D et al., "Fuchs endothelial corneal dystrophy in patients with myotonic dystrophy: a case series", Cornea, (20140000), vol. 33, pages 96 - 98 | - NIELSEN et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - GOVINDARAJUKUMAR, Chem Commun, (20050000), pages 495 - 497 | - EGHOLM et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 365, pages 566 - 568 | - MORITA et al., Nucleic Acid Res Supplement, (20010000), vol. 1, pages 241 - 242 | - HAGHIGHAT JAHROMI A et al., "Developing bivalent ligands to target CUG triplet repeats, the causative agent of Myotonic Dystrophy Type 1", J Med Chem, (20130000), vol. 56, pages 9471 - 9481 |