EP3983897 - METHOD FOR ENSURING AND MAINTAINING THE FUNCTION OF A COMPLETE SAFETY-CRITICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Autonomous Mobility Germany GmbH Ringlerstraße 17 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASCHA, Reinhold c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
HALILOVIC, Mirza c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
GURZAWSKI, Timo c/o Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20743960.5 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020DE200042 | Priority number, date | DE201910208729 | 14.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208729 | [2022/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249169 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983897 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3983897 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, G06F11/30, B60W50/02 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G06F11/0739 (EP);
G06F11/079 (EP);
G06F11/3013 (EP);
G06F11/3055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SICHERSTELLEN UND AUFRECHTERHALTEN DER FUNKTION EINES SICHERHEITSKRITISCHEN GESAMTSYSTEMS | [2022/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ENSURING AND MAINTAINING THE FUNCTION OF A COMPLETE SAFETY-CRITICAL SYSTEM | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR GARANTIR OU MAINTENIR LA FONCTION D'UN SYSTÈME GLOBAL CRITIQUE POUR LA SÉCURITÉ | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |