EP3990273 - ULTRASONIC COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Alexi J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JESME, Ronald D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
GABRIEL, Nicholas T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20744127.0 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020IB56035 | Priority number, date | US201962866403P | 25.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962866403 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020261182 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990273 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/08, A61B8/00, B32B7/12, B32B9/00, B32B27/08, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/36, B32B27/40 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/44 (CN);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/4272 (CN);
A61B8/4444 (CN);
A61B8/56 (CN);
A61K49/221 (CN);
A61K49/226 (CN);
A61N7/00 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/266 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B9/00 (EP);
A61B8/4236 (EP);
A61B8/4472 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2266/122 (EP,US);
B32B2307/728 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
B32B2535/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLKUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | ULTRASONIC COUPLING DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE ULTRASONORE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 22.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0800788 (LECTEC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,7,8,12,17,20 * page 4, line 50 - line 53 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 1 * * page 5, lines 19-20, 39-47 * * page 7, line 1 - line 9 * * figures 4,11; example 4; claims 1,7 * [A] 4-6,9-11,13-16,18,19; | [A]US6048323 (HON EDWARD H [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 9, line 16 - line 21 ** figures 8,9; claims 1,5,15,18/20 *; | [YA]WO2015130841 (ZETROZ INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,7,8,12,17,20 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * figures 1,16; claims 1,28-31 * [A] 4-6,9-11,13-16,18,19 | by applicant | US2016016338 | WO2016109168 | WO2016160359 | WO2017058698 | WO2018183098 | - DRTINA et al., Macromolecules, (19960000), vol. 29, pages 4486 - 4489 | - HARAGUCHI et al., Macromolecules, (20030000), vol. 36, pages 5732 - 5741 |