EP4153910 - AN ELECTRODE BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parat Halvorsen AS Tjørsvågstrand 27 4400 Flekkefjord / NO | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRØMLAND, Fred 4400 Flekkefjord / NO | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | AWA Norway AS P.O. Box 1052 Hoff 0218 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | AWA Norway AS Hoffsveien 1A 0275 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 20744162.7 | 22.05.2020 | [2023/13] | WO2020NO50135 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021235938 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153910 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4153910 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/28, F22B1/30 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
F22B1/303 (EP);
F22B1/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENKESSEL | [2023/13] | English: | AN ELECTRODE BOILER | [2023/13] | French: | CHAUDIÈRE À ÉLECTRODES | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB193405 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * page 8, line 8 - line 92; figure 9a *; | [XA]US4418269 (EATON-WILLIAMS RAYMOND H [GB]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,4,5 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 9 * [A] 2,3; | [XI]FR2604846 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 3; figure 1 * [I] 3; | [A]US2015316253 (ILIN ANDREY PAVLOVICH [RU]) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0070] - [0072]; figures 24-28 * | by applicant | GB472479 |