EP3902064 - ANTENNA MODULE HAVING PLURALITY OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS LAMINATED THEREIN, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Eunseok 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20744461.3 | 23.01.2020 | [2021/43] | WO2020KR01233 | Priority number, date | KR20190009284 | 24.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190009284 | [2021/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153823 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902064 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/06, H01Q9/28, H01Q9/04, H04M1/02, H04B1/00, H01Q1/24, H01Q21/28, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/38 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q21/065 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2283 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q21/062 (EP);
H01Q7/00 (US);
H01Q9/0407 (KR);
H01Q9/0414 (EP,US);
H01Q9/285 (KR);
H04B1/00 (EP);
H04B1/0064 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | H01Q21/06, H01Q9/28, H01Q9/04, H04M1/02, H04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | ANTENNENMODUL MIT MEHREREN DARIN LAMINIERTEN LEITERPLATTEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/43] | English: | ANTENNA MODULE HAVING PLURALITY OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS LAMINATED THEREIN, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2021/43] | French: | MODULE D'ANTENNE AYANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE CARTES DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ STRATIFIÉES EN SON SEIN, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | Translation filed | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015325925 (KAMGAING TELESPHOR TELES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]US2018062263 (UEDA HIDEKI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]US2018084637 (UEDA HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2018332151 (KAMGAING TELESPHOR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]WO2018210054 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 11,12* abstract * | International search | [X]JPS6336107B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION) [X] 1-15; | [A]KR20040041132 (KOREA INFOCOM CO LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2008283676 (TOTO LTD)[A] 1-15; | [A]US2013078915 (ZHAO SAM ZIQUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]KR101444905B (ILSHIN ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 |