EP3970256 - METHOD FOR SERVICING VEHICLE COMPONENTS USING A NETWORK SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDERICH, Marco Berliner Str. 107 38104 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
DÖRING, Martin Gebrüder-Grimm-Str. 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20745183.2 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP70748 | Priority number, date | DE201910211154 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019211154 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021018710 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970256 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, B60L53/67, G01R31/00, B60S1/02 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H02J7/00032 (EP);
B60L3/0023 (EP);
B60L53/66 (EP);
B60L53/68 (EP);
G01R31/006 (EP);
G07C5/008 (EP);
G07C5/0816 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WARTEN VON FAHRZEUGKOMPONENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NETZWERKSERVERS | [2022/12] | English: | METHOD FOR SERVICING VEHICLE COMPONENTS USING A NETWORK SERVER | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRETIEN DE COMPOSANTS DE VÉHICULE À L'AIDE D'UN SERVEUR RÉSEAU | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 17.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0115001 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9 * figure 3 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 25 * * page 12, lines 3-15 * * page 13, lines 1-17 * [I] 2,7; | [X]EP2775457 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 10 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0070] - [0089] * | by applicant | WO2004024531 |