EP3915273 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DETERMINING ACCURACY OF SPORT-RELATED INFORMATION EXTRACTED FROM DIGITAL VIDEO FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gracenote Inc. 2000 Powell Street, Suite 1380 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Jeffrey 2000 Powell Street, Suite 1380 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 02 /
CREMER, Markus Kurt Peter 2000 Powell Street, Suite 1380 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 03 /
PAREKH, Nishit Umesh 2000 Powell Street, Suite 1380 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 04 /
LEE, Dewey Ho 2000 Powell Street, Suite 1380 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
SCOTT, Jeffrey Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | ||
02 /
CREMER, Markus Kurt Peter Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | |||
03 /
PAREKH, Nishit Umesh Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | |||
04 /
LEE, Dewey Ho Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 20745591.6 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/48] | WO2020US14875 | Priority number, date | US201916257479 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: US201916257479 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020154557 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915273 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/81, H04N21/845, H04N21/431, H04N21/478, H04N21/4728, G06K9/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04N21/26603 (EP);
G06V20/635 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06V20/42 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (US);
H04N21/23418 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/8133 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/20036 (EP);
G06T2207/30221 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | H04N21/81, H04N21/845, H04N21/431, H04N21/478, H04N21/4728, G06K9/32, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GENAUIGKEIT VON AUS DIGITALEN VIDEOEINZELBILDERN EXTRAHIERTEN SPORTBEZOGENEN INFORMATIONEN | [2021/48] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DETERMINING ACCURACY OF SPORT-RELATED INFORMATION EXTRACTED FROM DIGITAL VIDEO FRAMES | [2021/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DESTINÉS À DÉTERMINER L'EXACTITUDE D'INFORMATIONS LIÉES AU SPORT EXTRAITES À PARTIR D'IMAGES VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUES | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008126160 (TAKUECHI HIRONORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2012219271 (VUNIC DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]US2012237182 (EYER MARK KENNETH [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]US2016353180 (PETAJAN ERIC DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] ** figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2004130567 (EKIN AHMET [NL], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2008089666 (AMAN JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-20; | [A]KR20160023518 (JEON WOOK [KR])[A] 1-20; | [A]US2016353180 (PETAJAN ERIC DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2018214760 (ANDREWS CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 | by applicant | US2008126160 | US2012237182 |