EP3999653 - PRODUCTION OF FATTY ACIDS FROM A SIEVE FRACTION OF ACTIVATED SLUDGE FROM TREATED WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HaskoningDHV Nederland B.V. Laan 1914 no 35 3818 EX Amersfoort / NL | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRIKS, Alexander Antonius Theodorus @Wilhelminus Maria c/o: Laan 1914 no. 35 3818 EX Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
OOSTERHUIS, Mathijs c/o: Laan 1914 no 35 3818 EX Amersfoort / NL | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Patent Business B.V., et al Lange Amerikaweg 81 7332 BP Apeldoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Vogels, Leonard Johan Paul c/o Patent Business B.V. Agro Business Park 50 6708 PW Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 20746305.0 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020NL50472 | Priority number, date | NL20192023573 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: NL 2023573 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021020964 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999653 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/52, C12P7/54, C02F11/04, C02F1/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C12P7/52 (EP);
C02F11/04 (EP);
C12P7/54 (EP);
C02F1/004 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F11/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FETTSÄUREN AUS EINER SIEBFRAKTION VON BELEBTSCHLAMM AUS BEHANDELTEM ABWASSER | [2022/21] | English: | PRODUCTION OF FATTY ACIDS FROM A SIEVE FRACTION OF ACTIVATED SLUDGE FROM TREATED WASTEWATER | [2022/21] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ACIDES GRAS À PARTIR D'UNE FRACTION DE TAMIS DE BOUES ACTIVÉES À PARTIR D'EAUX USÉES TRAITÉES | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 03.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - DAFNE CRUTCHIK ET AL, "Biorefinery of cellulosic primary sludge towards targeted Short Chain Fatty Acids, phosphorus and methane recovery", WATER RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180601), vol. 136, doi:10.1016/j.watres.2018.02.047, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 112 - 119, XP055737126 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 113, column l, lines 13-18 * [I] 4-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2018.02.047 | [ ] - Dafne Crutchik ET AL, "Supporting Information: Biorefinery of cellulosic primary sludge towards targeted Short Chain Fatty Acids, phosphorus and methane recovery", (20180601), URL: https://ars.els-cdn.com/content/image/1-s2.0-S0043135418301544-mmc1.docx, (20201006), XP055737322 [ ] * figures S1, S2 * | [XP] - DA ROS CINZIA ET AL, "Sieving of municipal wastewater and recovery of bio-based volatile fatty acids at pilot scale", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 174, doi:10.1016/J.WATRES.2020.115633, ISSN 0043-1354, (20200220), Database accession no. 115633, pages 1 - 10, (20200220), XP086099657 [XP] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2020.115633 | [A] - C.J. RUIKEN ET AL, "Sieving wastewater - Cellulose recovery, economic and energy evaluation", WATER RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130101), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.watres.2012.08.023, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 43 - 48, XP055736956 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2012.08.023 | [X] - JING XIE ET AL, "Influence of sulfadiazine on anaerobic fermentation of waste activated sludge for volatile fatty acids production: Focusing on microbial responses", CHEMOSPHERE, GB, (20190301), vol. 219, doi:10.1016/j.chemosphere.2018.12.015, ISSN 0045-6535, pages 305 - 312, XP055682830 [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chemosphere.2018.12.015 | by applicant | CN104450805 | CN104862346 | CN108384816 | - XIE et al., Chemosphere, (20190301), vol. 219, pages 305 - 312 | - MORGAN-SA-GASTUME et al., Bioresource Technology, (20110201), vol. 102, no. 3, pages 3089 - 3097 | - ZHANG et al., Water Research, (20090801), vol. 43, no. 15, pages 3735 - 3742 | - FANG WEI et al., J. Environmental Sciences, (20190605), vol. 87, pages 93 - 111 |