EP4003292 - SOFT CHEWABLE VETERINARY DOSAGE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORTHRUP, Laura, Ann 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | 02 /
FREEHAUF, Keith 126 E. Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
WALDRON, Niki 556 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
SUSKO, Timothy 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20746924.8 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP70527 | Priority number, date | US201962877070P | 22.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877070 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013825 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003292 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/24 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,CN);
A61K31/422 (US);
A61K31/365 (CN,US);
A61K31/4155 (US);
A61K31/42 (CN,US);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K47/44 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | WEICHE, KAUBARE TIERARZNEIFORM | [2022/22] | English: | SOFT CHEWABLE VETERINARY DOSAGE FORM | [2022/22] | French: | FORME GALÉNIQUE VÉTÉRINAIRE À MÂCHER MOLLE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005013714 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [AD]WO2013119442 (MERIAL LTD [US]); | by applicant | GB1390336 | US3950360 | US4134973 | EP0002916 | EP0007812 | US4199569 | US4310519 | US4427663 | US4468390 | US4855317 | US4859657 | US4871719 | US4874749 | US4920148 | US4963582 | US4973711 | US4978677 | US5055596 | US5077308 | NZ237086 | EP0677054 | US5824653 | WO2005085216 | US2007066617 | WO2007079162 | WO2009002809 | WO2009003075 | WO2009024541 | WO2009080250 | WO2010070068 | WO2010079077 | WO2013119442 | WO2015086551 |