EP3980870 - ARTIFICIAL REALITY SYSTEM HAVING A SLIDING MENU [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVASZ, Jonathan 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
STEVENS, Jasper 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
VARGA, Adam Tibor 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
PINCHON, Etienne 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
TICKNER, Simon Charles 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 06 /
SPURLOCK, Jennifer Lynn 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 07 /
SORGE-TOOMEY, Kyle Eric 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 08 /
ELLIS, Robert 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 09 /
FOX, Barrett 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20747255.6 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020US35998 | Priority number, date | US201916434919 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: US201916434919 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020247550 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980870 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0482 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/0304 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0482 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/017 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/012 (KR,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04842 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04847 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/04883 (CN);
G06T19/006 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM DER KÜNSTLICHEN REALITÄT MIT EINEM SCHIEBEMENÜ | [2022/15] | English: | ARTIFICIAL REALITY SYSTEM HAVING A SLIDING MENU | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉALITÉ ARTIFICIELLE À MENU COULISSANT | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]EP3155560 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]) [I] 1-10,13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0 56] , [ 1166] - [1168]; figures 3, 131A-I; claim 1 * [Y] 5,11,12,14; | [YA] - Barrett Fox ET AL, "Designing Singlehanded Shortcuts for VR & AR", (20180510), URL: https://www.roadtovr.com/leap-motion-designing-single-handed-shortcuts-for-vr-ar/, (20200901), XP055726766 [Y] 5,12,14 * sections "The First Gateway: Palm up", "The Second Gateway: Pinch" and "Spatial Interface Selection" (Variants #1, #2 and #3) * [A] 1-4,6-11,13 | [A] - Ben Lang, "Leap Motion 'Virtual Wearable' AR Prototype is a Potent Glimpse at the Future of Your Smartphone", (20180324), URL: https://www.roadtovr.com/leap-motion-virtual-wearable-ar-prototype-glimpse-of-future-smartphone/, (20200901), XP055726749 [A] 1-14 * tweet "Introducing Virtual Wearables" * | [Y] - Keiichi Matsuda, "Augmented City 3D [OFFICIAL]", (20100820), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=3TL80ScTLlM, (20200903), XP054980864 [Y] 11 * video segment [1:44]-[2:00] * | [A] - Andrew Newton, "Immersive Menus Demo", (20171008), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=_ow1RboHJDY, (20200903), XP054980860 [A] 1-14 * video segment [1:26]:[1:35] * |