EP3860577 - A LIPID-POLYMER HYBRID NANOPARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanobrid Innovations Private Limited Flat No. 159C, Rehmat Homes Kishanpura Dhakoli Zirakpur, SAS Nagar Mohali Punjab 40603 / IN | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITKARA, Deepak Department of Pharmacy Birla Institute of T.&S. Pilani (BITS-Pilani) Vidya Vihar Campus, Pilani Rajasthan 333031 / IN | 02 /
PUKALE, Sudeep Sudesh Department of Pharmacy Birla Institute of T.&S. Pilani (BITS-Pilani) Vidya Vihar Campus, Pilani Rajasthan 333031 / IN | 03 /
SINGH, Arihant Kumar Department of Pharmacy Birla Institute of T.&S. Pilani (BITS-Pilani) Vidya Vihar Campus, Pilani Rajasthan 333031 / IN | 04 /
MITTAL, Anupama Department of Pharmacy Birla Institute of T.&S. Pilani (BITS-Pilani) Vidya Vihar Campus, Pilani Rajasthan 333031 / IN | 05 /
SHARMA, Saurabh Department of Pharmacy Birla Institute of T.&S. Pilani (BITS-Pilani) Vidya Vihar Campus, Pilani Rajasthan 333031 / IN | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Southgate House Southgate Street Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL1 1UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Wynne-Jones IP Limited 2nd Floor, 5210 Valiant Court Gloucester Business Park Gloucester Gloucestershire GL3 4FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 20747680.5 | 02.02.2020 | [2021/32] | WO2020IB50819 | Priority number, date | IN201921004214 | 02.02.2019 Original published format: IN201921004214 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020157729 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860577 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K31/122, A61K31/337, A61K31/573, A61K9/107, A61K9/06, A61K9/00, A61K31/593 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/5146 (EP);
A61K9/5123 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61K31/337 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K31/593 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/513 (US);
A61K9/5153 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | A61K9/51, A61K47/10, A61K47/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | LIPID-POLYMER-HYBRIDNANOPARTIKEL | [2021/32] | English: | A LIPID-POLYMER HYBRID NANOPARTICLE | [2021/32] | French: | NANOPARTICULE HYBRIDE LIPIDE-POLYMÈRE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN102579341 (SHENGYANG PHARMACEUTICAL UNIVERSITY); | [X]CN102697721 (UNIV SOUTHWEST NATIONALITIES); | [X]US2015140104 (ASHFORD MARIANNE BERNICE [GB], et al); | [X]WO2015142605 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); |