EP3919642 - ALUMINUM ALLOY MATERIAL, AND ELECTROCONDUCTIVE MEMBER, BATTERY MEMBER, FASTENING COMPONENT, SPRING COMPONENT, STRUCTURAL COMPONENT AND CABTYRE CABLE EACH USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 6-4, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO Hiroshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KANEKO Hiroshi Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20747768.8 | 27.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP02832 | Priority number, date | JP20190016303 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019016303 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158682 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919642 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, C22C21/08, F16F1/02, // B22F5/12, C22C1/04, C22F1/04 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C22C21/08 (EP);
C22C21/06 (KR,US);
B60C9/0007 (KR);
C22C21/00 (EP);
C22C47/068 (KR);
C22F1/04 (EP,KR);
C22F1/047 (US);
F16F1/021 (EP);
F16F1/024 (KR);
B22F5/12 (EP);
C22C1/0416 (EP);
C22C2047/205 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | C22C21/00, C22F1/00, C22F1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSMATERIAL UND ELEKTRISCH LEITENDES ELEMENT, BATTERIEELEMENT, BEFESTIGUNGSTEIL, FEDERBAUTEIL, STRUKTURBAUTEIL SOWIE ROBUSTES UND FLEXIBLES KABEL DAMIT | [2021/49] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY MATERIAL, AND ELECTROCONDUCTIVE MEMBER, BATTERY MEMBER, FASTENING COMPONENT, SPRING COMPONENT, STRUCTURAL COMPONENT AND CABTYRE CABLE EACH USING SAME | [2021/49] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM ET ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROCONDUCTEUR, ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE, COMPOSANT DE FIXATION, COMPOSANT À RESSORT, COMPOSANT STRUCTURAL ET CÂBLE CABTYRE, CHACUN L'UTILISANT | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | Translation filed | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2018012482 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [XA]WO2018181505 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [P]EP3486341 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0060] - [0071]; figure 3; examples 1-17; table 1 *; | EP3604580 [ ] (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0099] , [ 100] , [ 107] - [0117]; figure 10; examples 13-28; table 2 *; | [E]EP3733887 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,5-10* comparative ex No 5; paragraphs [0055] - [0058] - [0 96]; table 1 *; | [E]EP3778947 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0064] - [0069]; figure 10; examples 1-29; tables 1, 2 * | International search | [A]WO2016088889 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2018155531 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2018181505 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [PA]WO2019188451 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP])[PA] 1-10 | by applicant | JPH05331585 | JPH09137244 | JP2001131721 | JP2003027172 | JP2010159445 |