EP3917383 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ORGANIZING AND FINDING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | Change: Appeal number | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal | 17.06.2024 | Deletion: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System, Inc. 57 Great Jones Street, 2 New York, NY 10012 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLY, Adam 57 Great Jones Street 2 New York, NY 10012 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
BLY, Adam New York, NY 10012 / US | Representative(s) | Halliwell, Bethan Frances Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20747877.7 | 30.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020US15871 | Priority number, date | US201962799981P | 01.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962799981 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020160264 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917383 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/901, G06N5/02 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/9024 (EP,US);
G06F16/24578 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F18/285 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N5/022 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | A61B5/00, G06F9/46, G06F11/34, G16H10/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM ORGANISIEREN UND AUFFINDEN VON DATEN | [2021/49] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ORGANIZING AND FINDING DATA | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ORGANISATION ET DE DÉCOUVERTE DE DONNÉES | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 03.04.2024 | Appeal received No. T0832/24 | 03.04.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 14.06.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2009217724 (PANASONIC CORP) | International search | [A]US2007179354 (STUPP STEVEN E [US], et al); | [A]US2012089621 (LIU PENG [CN], et al); | [A]US2015112978 (ARORA NEHA [US]); | [A]US9811438 (BARRETT RYAN [US], et al); |