EP3892027 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING EARLY FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT AND FAST REPORTING BY TERMINAL IN DISCONNECTED STATE IN NEXT GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Donggun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Soenghun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 20748185.4 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/41] | WO2020KR01583 | Priority number, date | KR20190013662 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190013662 | KR20190017618 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190017618 | KR20190023646 | 28.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190023646 | KR20190091571 | 29.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190091571 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159330 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892027 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W76/27, // H04W48/16 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W76/27 (KR);
H04W76/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | H04W24/10, H04W76/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER FRÜHEN FREQUENZMESSUNG UND ZUR SCHNELLEN MELDUNG DURCH EIN ENDGERÄT IM ABGESCHALTETEN ZUSTAND IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING EARLY FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT AND FAST REPORTING BY TERMINAL IN DISCONNECTED STATE IN NEXT GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER UNE MESURE DE FRÉQUENCE PRÉCOCE ET UN RAPPORT RAPIDE PAR TERMINAL DANS UN ÉTAT DÉCONNECTÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 12.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2019037425 (HONG SUNG-PYO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2019037635 (GUO YU-HSUAN [TW], et al) | International search | [A]US2016036541 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al); |