EP3919238 - MOBILE ROBOT AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Kyoungsuk IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Koh IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hyungsub IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sungwook IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KO, Kyoungsuk Seoul 06772 / KR | ||
02 /
CHOI, Koh Seoul 06772 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Hyungsub Seoul 06772 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sungwook Seoul 06772 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20748373.6 | 31.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020KR01479 | Priority number, date | KR20190012986 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190012986 | [2021/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020159278 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3919238 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919238 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05B15/02, B25J19/02, B25J19/06, B25J9/16, B25J11/00, G05D1/02, G08B13/196, G08B13/24 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP);
B25J11/00 (KR);
B25J9/1666 (KR,US);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J19/06 (KR);
B25J9/1676 (KR,US);
B25J9/1694 (US);
G05D1/0044 (EP);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/028 (EP);
G08B13/19647 (EP);
G08B13/2491 (EP);
G05B2219/31003 (EP);
G05B2219/31007 (EP);
G05B2219/45098 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | G05D1/00, G05D1/02, B25J11/00, B25J9/16, B25J19/06, B25J19/02, G05B15/02 | ||
Former IPC [2021/49] | B25J11/00, B25J9/16, B25J19/06, B25J19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILER ROBOTER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/49] | English: | MOBILE ROBOT AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2021/49] | French: | ROBOT MOBILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | Translation filed | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017026818 (BEAULIEU ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Paragraphs [0044], [0046], [0047], [0052]-[0054], [0057], [0059], Figures 1A, 3, 5. *; | [Y]US2018364350 (LEE SUNG JIN [KR]) [Y] 1-15* Paragraphs [0002]-[0003], [0008], [0013], [0044], [0049], [0053], Figures 5B, 12. * | International search | [Y]US2004027270 (FULLERTON LARRY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-16; | [A]KR101334961B [A] 1-16; | [A]US2017031360 (REIGO PETER [SE], et al)[A] 1-16; | [Y]JP2017531423 (IROBOT CORPORATION) [Y] 1-16; | [A]EP2945037 (IROBOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 | by applicant | KR20150125508 | US2017026818 |