EP3919584 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASORI, Yuuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 30, Asamutamachi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | 02 /
KAWATO, Nobuo c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 30, Asamutamachi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KASORI, Yuuki Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWATO, Nobuo Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20748717.4 | 29.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020JP03203 | Priority number, date | JP20190013922 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019013922 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158813 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919584 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K9/02, G02C7/02, G02C7/10, G02B1/04, C08G18/38, C08G18/48, G02B5/23, C08K5/1545, C08G18/24, C08G18/75 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/242 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
C08G18/3876 (EP,US);
C08G18/4825 (US);
C08G18/4837 (EP);
C08G18/6666 (US);
C08G18/758 (EP,US);
C08K5/1545 (US);
C08K5/521 (US);
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
G02B5/23 (EP);
C09K2211/1018 (US);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/041, C08L75/04, C08L81/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | C09K9/02, G02C7/02, G02C7/10, G02B1/04, C08G18/38, C08G18/48, G02B5/23 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLYMERISIERBAREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR OPTISCHES MATERIAL | [2021/49] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MATERIAL | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION POLYMÉRISABLE DESTINÉE À UN MATÉRIAU OPTIQUE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2021 | Translation filed | 23.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004138401 (BOJKOVA NINA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0180] - [0187] ** examples 4,10 *; | [XDPA]EP3527597 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XDP] 1,2,4-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0014] , [0079] - [0101] - [0253] * * example d52; table 17 * [A] 3 | International search | [A]WO2016143910 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2017047744 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2017047745 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2018021161 (TOKUYAMA CORP) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2018124063 (ITOH OPTICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2019009230 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [PA]JP2019215450 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC)[PA] 1-12 | by applicant | JPS6429489 | JPH01152182 | WO2004011506 | WO2009146509 | WO2010020770 | DE102009052986 | WO2012149599 | WO2012162725 | WO2014002844 | WO2014007154 | WO2015115648 | JP2019013922 | - P. ALEXANDRIDIST.A. HATTON, "Colloids Surfaces A: Physicochem", Eng. Aspects, (19950000), vol. 96, pages 1 - 46 | - Phys. Chem. Chem. Phys., (19990000), vol. 1, pages 3331 - 3334 | - Chem. Soc. Rev., (20120000), vol. 41, pages 5969 - 5985 |