EP3919476 - QUATERNARY AMMONIUM SALT COMPOUND, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states West China Hospital, Sichuan University No.37 Guoxue Xiang Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KE, Bowen No.37, Guoxue Xiang, Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jin No.37, Guoxue Xiang, Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Wensheng No.37, Guoxue Xiang, Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Jun No.37, Guoxue Xiang, Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | 05 /
TANG, Lei No.37, Guoxue Xiang, Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KE, Bowen Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Jin Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Wensheng Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | |||
04 /
YANG, Jun Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | |||
05 /
TANG, Lei Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20748885.9 | 21.01.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN73387 | Priority number, date | CN201910102803 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910102803 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156359 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919476 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/60, C07D207/16, C07D205/04, C07D223/06, C07C237/00, A61P23/02, A61K31/167 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61P23/02 (EP,CN);
C07D211/60 (EP,CN,US);
C07D205/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,CN,US);
C07D223/06 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/06 (CN,US);
C07D413/12 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | QUARTÄRE AMMONIUMSALZVERBINDUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/49] | English: | QUATERNARY AMMONIUM SALT COMPOUND, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2021/49] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE SEL D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | Translation filed | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018121427 (JENKEM TECH CO LTD TIANJIN [CN]); | [E]EP3750870 (WEST CHINA HOSPITAL SICHUAN UNIV [CN]) | International search | [A]CN1295558 (ADVANCED MEDICINE INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-7, 35 and 40, and description, page 48 and 49, tables, and compounds 106-112 *; | [A]CN103601650 (WEST CHINA HOSPITAL SICHUAN UNIV) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [PX]CN110156665 (WEST CHINA HOSPITAL SICHUAN UNIV) [PX] 1-6, 8-11 * claims 1-15 and 20-24 * | by applicant | - COURTNEY KR, J Pharmacol Exp Ther., (19750000), vol. 195, pages 225 - 236 | - CRAIGR, Ries. Anesthesiology., (20090000), vol. 111, pages 122 - 126 | - DANIEL S. KOHANE, PNAS, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 3745 - 3750 |