EP3993848 - BLOOD BAG SYSTEM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGARASHI, Masatsugu c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 818, Misonodaira Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-0004 / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20749975.7 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020JP27772 | Priority number, date | JP20190134526 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019134526 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015112 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993848 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/02, A61J1/10 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
A61M1/0218 (US);
A61M1/0227 (US);
B29C43/36 (US);
B29D22/003 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | BLUTBEUTELSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/19] | English: | BLOOD BAG SYSTEM AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POCHE DE SANG ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 01.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0615735 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [XI]US5836933 (BUTTITTA ANTHONY D [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2015159855 |