EP3996519 - FAT COATED PARTICULATE ENZYME COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Køpenhaven K / DK | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Shukun Edwin Rahrs Vej 38 8220 Brabrand / DK | 02 /
TSE, Kathryn Louise Edwin Rahrs Vej 38 8220 Brabrand / DK | 03 /
LI, Wenting 25 Jonathan Drive Newark, Delaware 19702 / US | 04 /
MARCHAL, Leon Archimedesweg 30 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 05 /
VILJANEN, Jouni Sokeritehtaantie 20 02460 Kantvik / FI | 06 /
KRAGH, Karsten Matthias Edwin Rahrs Vej 38 8220 Brabrand / DK | 07 /
HORSMANS POULSEN, Charlotte Edwin Rahrs Vej 38 8220 Brabrand / DK | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20750044.8 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41301 | Priority number, date | US201962871814P | 09.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962871814 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007379 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996519 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/18, A23K20/105, A23K20/111, A23K20/158, A23K20/189, A23K20/20, A23K20/22, A23K20/24, A23K50/10, A23K40/30 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A23K20/189 (EP,CN,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,CN,US);
A23K10/18 (EP,CN,US);
A23K10/22 (CN);
A23K10/26 (CN);
A23K10/30 (CN);
A23K10/37 (CN);
A23K10/38 (CN);
A23K20/105 (EP,CN,US);
A23K20/111 (EP,CN);
A23K20/147 (CN);
A23K20/158 (EP,CN,US);
A23K20/20 (EP);
A23K20/22 (EP,US);
A23K20/24 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | FETTBESCHICHTETE TEILCHENFÖRMIGE ENZYMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/19] | English: | FAT COATED PARTICULATE ENZYME COMPOSITIONS | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À ENZYMES PARTICULAIRES ENROBÉES DE MATIÈRE GRASSE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 14.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/06] | 16.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/06] | 16.09.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1217365 (LABATT LTD JOHN [CA]) [Y] 3,9,11,45,51,53 * page 1 - page 3, column 1, paragraph 15; example 2; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]GB1306018 ((SMIK) SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB) [Y] 65 * the whole document *; | [IY]GB2153199 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [I] 15-19,30-35,57-61,65 * page 1, line 52; examples 5-9; claims 1-3 * [Y] 21-29,37-41,62-65; | [XYI]US2008031998 (MARCUSSEN ERIC [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,12,20,30,31,42,44,46-50,52,54 * paragraphs [0008] - [0250]; examples 2-13; claims 1-34 * [Y] 3,9,11,45,51,53 [I] 13,14,32-35,43,55,56; | [Y]WO2015197719 (DUPONT NUTRITION BIOSCI APS [DK]) [Y] 23-29,64* the whole document *; | [I]CN109527224 (ZHUHAI TIANKAI BIOLOGICAL TECH CO LTD) [I] 36 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MURILLO A P MESCHIATTI ET AL, "Feeding the combination of essential oils and exogenous [alpha]-amylase increases performance and carcass production of finishing beef cattle1", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, US, (20181023), vol. 97, no. 1, doi:10.1093/jas/sky415, ISSN 0021-8812, pages 456 - 471, XP055746090 [Y] 21,22,37-41,62,63 * abstract * * page 465, column 1 - page 469, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jas/sky415 | by applicant | WO8402921 | EP0135138 | WO8601831 | US4587215 | USRE32153E | US4689297 | US4727026 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | WO9200381 | WO9212645 | WO9219729 | US5324649 | WO9425583 | EP0656058 | WO9716076 | US5739091 | WO9820115 | WO9928448 | WO0004136 | EP0804532 | WO0104273 | US6248706 | US6287841 | WO0183727 | US6423517 | US6534466 | WO2004085638 | WO2005045018 | WO2006038062 | WO2006038128 | WO2006037328 | WO2006037327 | WO2006043178 | WO2006069289 | WO2007044968 | WO2007112739 | WO2007124285 | WO2008045489 | WO2008092901 | WO2008097619 | US2008263688 | WO2009048487 | WO2009048488 | WO2009129489 | US2009280090 | US7754469 | WO2011117396 | US8058033 | WO2012110778 | WO2013029013 | WO2013189972 | WO2017112635 | WO2018057420 | WO2019173424 | WO2020106796 | - MEALE et al., J. Anim. Sci., (20140000), vol. 92, pages 427 - 442 | - ARRIOLA et al., J. Dairy Sci., (20170000), vol. 100, pages 4650 - 4670 | - DILORENZO et al., Livestock Science, (20110000), vol. 137, pages 178 - 184 | - HESS et al., Science, (20110000), vol. 331, pages 463 - 467 | - BROCK et al., Appl. Environ Microbiol., (19820000), vol. 44, pages 561 - 569 | - "Fats and Fatty Oils", Ullmann's Encyclopaedia of Industrial Chemistry, vol. 4.3, 8 | - BOEL et al., EMBO J., (19840000), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 1097 - 1102 | - HATA et al., Agric. Biol. Chem., (19910000), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 941 - 949 | - CHEN et al., Prot. Eng., (19960000), vol. 9, pages 499 - 505 | - CHEN et al., Prot. Eng., (19950000), vol. 8, pages 575 - 582 | - CHEN et al., Biochem. J., (19940000), vol. 301, pages 275 - 281 | - FIEROBE et al., Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 35, pages 8698 - 8704 | - LI et al., Protein Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, pages 1199 - 1204 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. XP_001390530.1 | - NAGASAKA et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 50, pages 323 - 330 | - BAILEY et al., Journal of Biotechnology, (19920500), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 257 - 270 | - DESAIPARK, Journal of Food Engineering, (20020000), vol. 53, pages 325 - 340 | - Drying Technol., (20050000), vol. 23, pages 1361 - 1394 | - TEUNOUPONCELET, J. Food Engineer., (20020000), vol. 53, pages 325 - 40 | - DUFRENEIX et al., J. Dairy Sci., (20190000), vol. 102, pages 3010 - 3022 | - GILBERT MS, VAN DEN BORNE JJGCBERENDS HPANTOPHLET AJSCHOLS HAGERRITS WJJ., "A titration approach to identify the capacity for starch digestion in milk-fed calves", Animals, (20150000), vol. 9, pages 249 - 57 | WO2007US66618 | WO2009US41011 | WO2010IB51804 | GB20100011513 | WO2011IB53018 |