EP4018265 - MICROMIRROR ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | For all designated states IMEC VZW Patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASPESLAGH, Luc Roger Simonne Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
ROCHUS, Veronique Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
BRONDANI TORRI, Guilherme Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 04 /
HALBACH, Alexandre Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
PANDEY, Nitesh P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 06 /
GOORDEN, Sebastianus Adrianus P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20750273.3 | 05.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020EP72006 | Priority number, date | EP20190192294 | 19.08.2019 Original published format: EP 19192294 | EP20190199722 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19199722 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032484 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018265 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G02B26/08 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G03F7/70116 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B26/085 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B81B3/0021 (US);
B81B7/0087 (US);
G03F7/7015 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B81B2201/042 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | MIKROSPIEGEL-ARRAYS | [2022/26] | English: | MICROMIRROR ARRAYS | [2022/26] | French: | RÉSEAUX DE MICROMIROIRS | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 18.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1591824 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2009279066 (TINNEMANS PATRICIUS ALOYSIUS JACOBUS [NL], et al); | [XY]DE102013206531 (ZEISS CARL SMT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2018088347 (VAN DER ZOUW GERBRAND [NL], et al); | [Y]US2018246415 (XALTER STEFAN [DE], et al) |