EP4004791 - IDENTIFICATION OF SUSCEPTIBILITY TO INDUCED CHARGE LEAKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAROIU, Stefan MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
COJOCAR, Lucian MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
WOLMAN, Alastair MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20750523.1 | 09.06.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US36827 | Priority number, date | US201916528053 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: US201916528053 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021301 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004791 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/64, G11C29/00, G11C29/50 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP);
G11C29/50 (CN);
G11C29/50016 (US);
G11C29/006 (EP);
G11C29/04 (EP);
G11C29/06 (EP);
G11C29/16 (EP);
G11C29/18 (EP);
G11C29/32 (EP);
G11C29/44 (EP);
G11C29/56 (CN);
G11C2029/0403 (EP);
G11C2029/0409 (EP);
G11C2029/1202 (EP);
G11C2029/1806 (EP);
G11C2029/5004 (CN);
G11C2029/5006 (EP,CN);
G11C29/42 (EP);
G11C29/46 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG DER ANFÄLLIGKEIT GEGEN INDUZIERTEN LADUNGSAUSTRITT | [2022/22] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF SUSCEPTIBILITY TO INDUCED CHARGE LEAKAGE | [2022/22] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE LA SENSIBILITÉ À UNE FUITE DE CHARGE INDUITE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 03.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003167428 (GOLD SPENCER [US]); | [A]US2009016115 (MORANCHO-MONTAGNER LAURENCE [FR], et al); | [A]US2014059287 (BAINS KULJIT [US], et al); |