EP3983035 - VAPORIZABLE MATERIAL INSERT FOR VAPORIZER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juul Labs, Inc. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINS, Ariel 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
GARCIA-DOTY, Ian 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
GONZALEZ, Eddie G. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
VIEIRA, Paul R. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20750840.9 | 10.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US37047 | Priority number, date | US201962860747P | 12.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962860747 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252062 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983035 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/04, A24F40/42, A61M15/06 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24D3/17 (US);
A24F40/10 (US);
A24F40/20 (US);
A24F40/42 (US);
A61M11/042 (EP);
A24F40/57 (EP);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | EINSATZ FÜR VERDAMPFBARES MATERIAL FÜR VERDAMPFERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/16] | English: | VAPORIZABLE MATERIAL INSERT FOR VAPORIZER DEVICE | [2022/16] | French: | INSERT DE MATIÈRE VAPORISABLE POUR VAPOTEUSE | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 01.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2016079589 (FONTEM HOLDINGS 2 BV [NL]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-15,17,18,20-26,28-33 * figures 11,25C,25D * [I] 5,8,16,19,27,30; | [IA]US2017156403 (GILL MARK [GB], et al) [I] 1-22 * figures 1-5 *[A] 23-33; | [I]US2018110263 (BORKOVEC VACLAV [DE], et al) [I] 1-33 * figures 2b,2c,3 * |