EP3996813 - PHENYL COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF, AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cura Therapeutics, LLC 505 Coast Blvd South, Suite 302 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWJI, Nazneen 3405 Stadium Place San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20750944.9 | 10.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41497 | Priority number, date | US201962873137P | 11.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962873137 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007474 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996813 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61P25/00, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P27/02, A61K31/18, A61K31/63 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | PHENYLVERBINDUNGEN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON SOWIE DEREN THERAPEUTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2022/19] | English: | PHENYL COMPOUNDS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS THEREOF, AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE PHÉNYLE ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ASSOCIÉES, ET LEURS APPLICATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 05.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/07] | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/07] | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3954994 (HOLLAND GERALD F, et al) [X] 1-4,21,22,36-56 * tables *; columns 18-43 * * examples I-XVI * * claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9936398 (LILLY CO ELI [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-10,12,13,36-38,40-42,47-52,58-73 * abstract * * page 9, line 11 - page 11, line 24 * * example 5 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]WO0050391 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-81 * examples 1-636 * * claims 1-26 *; | [Y]WO2004033418 (ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 1-81 * abstract * * examples 1-209 * * claims 1-22 *; | [Y]WO2005026134 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-81 * abstract * * last full paragraph *; page 2 * * compounds *; pages 17-21 * * page 38, paragraph 4 - page 40, paragraph 1 * * examples 1-9 * * claims 1-31 *; | [X]WO2005085189 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-5,23-25,27,32,33,36,39,41,47-52,58-72,75,76,79 * abstract * * page 72; table 1; compounds 1a-1f * * claims 1-49 *; | [Y]JP2006160752 (NEUROTECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-81 * abstract * * scheme *; page 9 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2007071443 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,23-25,27,32,33,36,37,39-41,47-52,58-74 * abstract * * page 18, line 12 - page 19, line 7 * * table *; pages 52-56; compounds 6, 9, 10, 15, 24-29 * * claims 1-16 *; | [X]JP2008308493 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL) [X] 1,3,23,34-38,40,41,43-48,50,52,58-64,73 * abstract * * page 32; compounds 12-46 * * page 48; compounds 2-4 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]US2012094964 (INOUE TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-13,36-45,47-56,58-63 * examples 56, 81-83 * * examples 110-126 * * claims 1-11 *; | [X]US9416101 (ORTON DARREN [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,12-14,19,20,36-38,40-45,47-55 * abstract * * columns 85-87 * * examples 1-64 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO2017011323 (UNIV MARYLAND [US]) [X] 1,3,4,23-26,36-41,47-52,58-63 * abstract * * compounds *; pages 86-98 * * tables *; pages 168-177 * * table *; page 184 * * compounds *; pages 185-196 * * claims 1-21 *; | [X]WO2017160069 (MEDICINAL BIOCONVERGENCE RES CT [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,23-25,27,32,33,36-38,40,41,47-52,58-73 * abstract * * table *; pages 30-60; compounds 2,37,38,40,47,49,57,84,146,155,226,233 * * claims 1-15 *; | [X]CN109293537 (UNIV CHINA PHARMA) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,14,19,20,36-38,40-43,47-53 * page 7; compounds III-2 *; | [X]CN109651208 (SHANGHAI INST MATERIA MEDICA CAS) [X] 1,3,6-9,12,14,19,20,36-38,40,41,43,47-52,58-73 * abstract * * compounds *; pages 14-16 * * examples 59, 85 * * claims 1-10 *; | [IP]WO2019139869 (CURA THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]) [IP] 1-81 * abstract * * pages 47-48 * * examples 1-4 ** claims 1-82 *; | [X] - MAURIZIO PULICI ET AL, "Optimization of Diarylthiazole B-Raf Inhibitors: Identification of a Compound Endowed with High Oral Antitumor Activity, Mitigated hERG Inhibition, and Low Paradoxical Effect", CHEMMEDCHEM, DE, (20141127), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1002/cmdc.201402424, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 276 - 295, XP055730245 [X] 1,2,4,23-26,36-39,41-43,47-53 * page 277; compound 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201402424 | [X] - NIRMAL PAHADI ET AL, "Catalytic Intermolecular Hydroamination of Vinyl Ethers", SYNLETT, DE, (20091021), vol. 2009, no. 19, doi:10.1055/s-0029-1218293, ISSN 0936-5214, pages 3135 - 3138, XP055730250 [X] 1,3,23-26,36-38,40,41,47-52 * page 3136; table 1; compound 3j * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0029-1218293 | [X] - ZHOU YANG ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of novel (E)-N'-(2,3-dihydro-1H-inden-1-ylidene) benzohydrazides as potent LSD1 inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150620), vol. 26, no. 18, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2015.06.054, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 4552 - 4557, XP029695096 [X] 1,4,6-8,10,12-14,19,20,36-38,40-42,47-52 * scheme 2 *; page 4554; compounds 2, 3 * * page 45554; table 2; compounds 6d, 6e, 6k, 6l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2015.06.054 | [X] - HANKE THOMAS ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological characterization of benzenesulfonamides as dual species inhibitors of human and murine mPGES-1", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL, (20131016), vol. 21, no. 24, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2013.10.006, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 7874 - 7883, XP028796474 [X] 1,3,6-9,12,13,36-38,40,41,47-52,58-63 * abstract * * page 7877; table 2; compounds 11, 14, 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2013.10.006 | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US4328245 | US4409239 | US4410545 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5323907 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5612059 | US5639476 | US5639480 | US5674533 | US5698220 | US5709874 | US5733566 | US5739108 | US5759542 | US5798119 | US5840674 | US5891474 | US5900252 | US5922356 | US5972891 | US5972366 | US5980945 | US5985307 | US5993855 | US6004534 | US6039975 | US6045830 | US6048736 | US6060082 | US6071495 | US6087324 | US6113943 | US6120751 | US6131570 | US6139865 | US6197350 | US6248363 | US6253872 | US6264970 | US6267981 | US6271359 | US6274552 | US6316652 | US6350458 | WO0217918 | US6376461 | US6419961 | US6589548 | US6613358 | US6699500 | - BALLARD et al., Lancet, (20110000), vol. 377, pages 1019 - 1031 | - KUMARWALTER, Aging, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 803 - 812 | - MASTERS et al., Nat. Rev. Dis. Primers, (20150000), vol. 1, page 15056 | - FRIGERIOSTROOPER, Annu. Rev. Neurosci., (20160000), vol. 39, pages 57 - 79 | - ISRAEL et al., Nature, (20120000), vol. 482, pages 216 - 220 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - HARPER, Progress in Drug Research, (19620000), vol. 4, pages 221 - 294 | - GANGWAR et al., Des. Biopharm. Prop. Prodrugs Analogs, (19770000), pages 409 - 421 | - BUNDGAARD, Controlled Drug Delivery, (19870000), vol. 17, pages 179 - 96 | - FLEISHER et al., Methods Enzymol., (19850000), vol. 112, pages 360 - 381 | - WANG et al., Curr. Pharm. Design, (19990000), vol. 5, pages 265 - 287 | - PAULETTI et al., Adv. Drug. Delivery Rev., (19970000), vol. 27, pages 235 - 256 | - MIZEN et al., Pharm. Biotech., (19980000), vol. 11, pages 345 - 365 | - GAIGNAULT et al., Pract. Med. Chem., (19960000), pages 671 - 696 | - VERMA et al., Drug Development and Industrial Pharmacy, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 695 - 708 | - BALANT et al., Eur. J. DrugMetab. Pharmacokinet., (19900000), vol. 15, pages 143 - 53 | - BALIMANESINKO, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19990000), vol. 39, pages 117 - 151 | - BROWNE, Clin. Neuropharmacol., (19970000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 12 | - BUNDGAARD, Arch. Pharm. Chem., (19790000), vol. 86, pages 1 - 39 | - BUNDGAARD, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19920000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - SINHABABUTHAKKER, Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19960000), vol. 19, pages 131 - 148 | - FARQUHAR et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19830000), vol. 72, pages 324 - 325 | - FREEMAN et al., J. Chem. Soc., Chem. Commun., (19910000), pages 875 - 877 | - FRIISBUNDGAARD, Eur. J. Pharm. Sci., (19960000), vol. 4, pages 49 - 59 | - NATHWANIWOOD, Drugs, (19930000), vol. 45, pages 866 - 94 | - STELLA et al., Drugs, (19850000), vol. 29, pages 455 - 73 | - VALENTINOBORCHARDT, Drug Discovery Today, (19970000), vol. 2, pages 148 - 155 | - WALLER et al., Br. J. Clin. Pharmac., (19890000), vol. 28, pages 497 - 507 | - TAKADA, Encyclopedia of Controlled Drug Delivery, Wiley, (19990000), vol. 2 | - SANTUSBAKER, J. Controlled Release, (19950000), vol. 35, pages 1 - 21 | - VERMA et al., J. Controlled Release, (20020000), vol. 79, pages 7 - 27 |