EP4003695 - METHOD FOR DIGITALLY PRODUCING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT HAVING INTEGRATED FUNCTIONALITIES AND OPTICAL ELEMENT THUS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMANN, Gerhard c/o ISC Fraunhofer-Institut für Silicatforschung Neunerplatz 2 97082 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
STEENHUSEN, Sönke c/o ISC Fraunhofer-Institut für Silicatforschung Neunerplatz 2 97082 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
KLEIN, Matthias c/o ISC Fraunhofer-Institut für Silicatforschung Neunerplatz 2 97082 Würzburg / DE | 04 /
REHBERGER, Matthias c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Lasertechnik Steinbachstraße 15 52074 Aachen / DE | 05 /
MITLACHER, Matthias c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Lasertechnik Steinbachstraße 15 52074 Aachen / DE | 06 /
VEDDER, Christian c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Lasertechnik Steinbachstraße 15 52074 Aachen / DE | 07 /
NIPPGEN, Sebastian Heckstraße 56 52080 Aachen / DE | 08 /
BECKERT, Erik c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | 09 /
KEMPER, Falk c/o Fraunhofer Institut für Angewandte Optik und Feinmechanik Albert-Einstein-Str. 7 07745 Jena / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20751073.6 | 09.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020EP69395 | Priority number, date | DE201910211001 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019211001 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021013567 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003695 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/112, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B29C64/106, B33Y80/00, B29C64/135, B29C64/273, B33Y30/00, C07F7/18, C08G77/00, C08L83/04, C08G77/14, C08G77/20, C08G77/28, B29D11/00, B29L11/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,KR);
B29C64/112 (EP,KR);
B29C64/124 (KR);
B29C64/135 (EP,KR);
B29C64/273 (EP,KR);
B29D11/00 (EP,KR);
B29D11/00432 (EP,KR);
B29D11/0074 (EP,KR);
B33Y10/00 (EP,KR);
B33Y30/00 (EP,KR);
B33Y80/00 (EP,KR);
C07F7/1804 (EP,KR);
C07F7/188 (EP,KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR);
B29C64/106 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIGITALEN ERZEUGUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTS MIT INTEGRIERTEN FUNKTIONALITÄTEN UND DERART HERGESTELLTES OPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2022/22] | English: | METHOD FOR DIGITALLY PRODUCING AN OPTICAL ELEMENT HAVING INTEGRATED FUNCTIONALITIES AND OPTICAL ELEMENT THUS PRODUCED | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION NUMÉRIQUE D'UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE À FONCTIONNALITÉS INTÉGRÉES ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE AINSI PRODUIT | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 24.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015291833 (KUNC VLASTIMIL [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *; | [XI] - S SURESH NAIR ET AL, "Additive Manufacturing of Functional (Photoluminescent) Optical Components", 119. DGAO TAGUNG, (20180720), XP055740561 [X] 1-5,8,9,12-17 * figures 1-5 * * table 1 * * Kapitel 1-5 * [I] 6,7,10,11,18 | [A] - SURESH NAIR S ET AL, "3D-printed optical active components", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE ISSN 0277-786X VOLUME 10524], SPIE, US, (20180221), vol. 10529, doi:10.1117/12.2287427, ISBN 978-1-5106-1533-5, pages 105290W - 105290W, XP060102261 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2287427 | by applicant | DE102017002986 | EP2943331 |