EP3817599 - AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT&G Corporation 71, Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong Sub Rm.532 37 Seongnam-daero 925beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13496 / KR | 02 /
OH, Sung Rok 1331-203 34 Gosan-ro 677beon-gil Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 15802 / KR | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20751468.8 | 28.04.2020 | [2021/19] | WO2020KR05570 | Priority number, date | KR20190050995 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: KR 20190050995 | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222496 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817599 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/51, A24F40/42, A24F40/10 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F40/51 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (CN,KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (CN);
A24F40/50 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2257618 (AID MEDIC LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13* page 9 - page 18; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]KR101324667B (-) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]WO2017216516 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 5, line 10 - line 19; figure 1 * [Y] 10-13 [I] 4,5,7-9; | [XAI]US2019083720 (LEADLEY DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074]; figures 10A-B * [A] 10-13 [I] 5,7-9 | International search | [A]JP2006505281 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.) [A] 1-13* See the whole documrnt. *; | [Y]KR101324667B (FUTURE CYBER, INC. et al.) [Y] 3, 4, 10 * See paragraphs [0042], [0053]; and figures 1, 3. *; | [A]WO2016066635 (JT INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-13 * See the whole documrnt. *; | [XYA]WO2017216516 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1, 2, 5 * See page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 9; and figure 1. * [Y] 3, 4, 6, 10 [A] 7-9, 11-13; | [Y]WO2018107018 (MICRODOSE THERAPEUTX INC [US]) [Y] 6 * See paragraphs [0003], [0032]; and figure 4. * | by applicant | WO2017216516 |