EP3982986 - SECRETED MICROBIAL EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLOK, Alicia c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BODMER, Mark c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
BOSE, Baundauna c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
CARLTON, Sofia M.R. c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
CORMACK, Taylor A. c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
DAVITT, Christopher J. H. 3 Danforth Street Unit B Jamaica Plain, Massachusetts 02130 / US | 07 /
FRANCISCO-ANDERSON, Loise c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 08 /
GOODMAN, Brian 16 McBride Street 1 Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | 09 /
ITANO, Andrea c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 10 /
OKAN, Nihal c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 11 /
PONICHTERA, Holly c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 12 /
TROY, Erin B. c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 13 /
ROMANO-CHERNAC, Fabian B. c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 14 /
SIZOVA, Maria c/o Evelo Biosciences, Inc. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20751723.6 | 11.06.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US37201 | Priority number, date | US201962860029P | 11.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962860029 P | US201962860049P | 11.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962860049 P | US202062979545P | 21.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062979545 P | US202062991767P | 19.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062991767 P | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252144 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982986 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K35/745, A61K35/744, A61P37/00, A61P35/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,CN,US);
A61K35/744 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P29/00 (CN,KR);
A61P3/00 (CN,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61P37/04 (CN,KR);
A61P37/06 (CN,KR,US);
A61K2035/115 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | SEKRETIERTE MIKROBIELLE EXTRAZELLULÄRE VESIKEL | [2022/16] | English: | SECRETED MICROBIAL EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES | [2022/16] | French: | VÉSICULES EXTRACELLULAIRES MICROBIENNES SÉCRÉTÉES | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP3403670 (MD HEALTHCARE INC [KR]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * paragraphs [0006] , [0011] , [0 17] , [0 42]; claims 1-11 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI]WO2019010255 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * Examples; paragraph [0005]; claims 1-133 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI]WO2019051380 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * Examples; paragraphs [0002] , [0081] , [0300] , [0332]; claims 1-161; table 1 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI]WO2019051381 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * Examples;; claims 1-181 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI]WO2019099482 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * Examples; paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0066] , [0 97] - [0100] - [0243]; claims 1-129 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI]WO2019099682 (EVELO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-17,23-65,68-73,76 * Examples;; claims 1-94 * [I] 18-22,66,67,74,75; | [XI] - CHIL-SUNG KANG ET AL, "Extracellular Vesicles Derived from Gut Microbiota, Especially Akkermansia muciniphila, Protect the Progression of Dextran Sulfate Sodium-Induced Colitis", PLOS ONE, (20130101), vol. 8, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0076520, ISSN 1932-6203, pages e76520 - e76520, XP055106720 [X] 1,40,42,63,68 * abstract * * Introduction and Discussion * [I] 1-76 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0076520 | by applicant | - PEARSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - DEVEREUX, J. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, no. I, page 387 | - S. F. et al., J Molec Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 | - CARILLO, SIAM J Applied Math, (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - SCHOCH et al., "Nuclear ribosomal internal transcribed spacer (ITS) region as a universal DNA barcode marker for Fungi", PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, doi:10.1073/pnas.1117018109, pages 6241 - 6246, XP055194048 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1117018109 | - Nucleic Acids Res, vol. 38, page e200 | - KONSTANTINIDIS KTRAMETTE ATIEDJE JM, "The bacterial species definition in the genomic era", Philos Trans R Soc Lond B Biol Sci, (20060000), vol. 361, pages 1929 - 1940 | - ACHTMAN MWAGNER M., "Microbial diversity and the genetic nature of microbial species", Nat. Rev. Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/nrmicro1872, pages 431 - 440, XP055597710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro1872 | - S. BIN PARK et al., PLoS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 3, page el7629 | - G. NORHEIM et al., PLoS ONE, (20150000), vol. 10, no. 9, page e0134353 | - JEPPESEN et al., Cell, (20190000), vol. 177, page 428 | - LEEKHA et al., "General Principles of Antimicrobial Therapy", Mayo Clin Proc., (20110000), vol. 86, no. 2, doi:10.4065/mcp.2010.0639, pages 156 - 167, XP055372896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4065/mcp.2010.0639 | - WEISSTHIERRY, "Mechanisms and consequences of intestinal dysbiosis", Cellular and Molecular Life Sciences, (20170000), vol. 74, no. 16, doi:10.1007/s00018-017-2509-x, pages 2959 - 2977, XP036272294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-017-2509-x | - Zurich Open Repository and Archive, URL: https://doi.org/10.1007/s00018-017-2509-x | - HOOKSO'MALLEY, Dysbiosis and its discontents, American Society for Microbiology, (20171000), vol. 8, pages e01492 - 17 | - CITI, S, "Intestinal Barriers protect against disease", Science, (20180000), vol. 359, pages 1098 - 99 | - SRINIVASAN et al., "TEER measurement techniques for in vitro barrier model systems", J. Lab. Autom., (20150000), vol. 20, doi:10.1177/2211068214561025, pages 107 - 126, XP055560328 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/2211068214561025 | - LYNCH et al., "The Human Microbiome in Health and Disease", N. Engl. J. Med ., (20160000), vol. 375, pages 2369 - 79 | - CARDING et al., "Dysbiosis of the gut microbiota in disease", Microb. Ecol. Health Dis., (20150000), vol. 26, page 10 | - LEVY et al., "Dysbiosis and the Immune System", Nature Reviews Immunology, (20170400), vol. 17, page 219 | - THEIN et al., "Efficient subfractionation of gram-negative bacteria for proteomics studies", J. Proteome Res., (20101203), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 6135 - 47 | - SANDRINI et al., "Fractionation by Ultracentrifugation of Gram negative cytoplasmic and membrane proteins", Bio-Protocol., (20140000), vol. 4, no. 21 | - BACHURSKI et al., Journal of Extracellular Vesicles, (20190000), vol. 8, no. 1 | - MALETZKI et al., Gut, (20080000), vol. 57, pages 483 - 491 | - BOBEK V. et al., "Syngeneic lymph-node-targeting model of green fluorescent protein-expressing Lewis lung carcinoma", Clin. Exp. Metastasis, (20040000), vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1007/s10585-004-8118-8, pages 705 - 8, XP019235796 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10585-004-8118-8 | - DEVIREN G. et al., "Detection of antigen-specific T cells on p/MHC microarrays", J. Mol. Recognit., (20070100), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1002/JMR.805, pages 32 - 8, XP002667108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JMR.805 | - PETERSEN et al., "In vivo pharmacological disease models for psoriasis and atopic dermatitis in drug discovery", Basic & Clinical Pharm & Toxicology, (20060000), vol. 99, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1742-7843.2006.pto_298.x, pages 104 - 115, XP055360626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-7843.2006.pto_298.x | - "Mouse Models of Innate Immunity: Methods and Protocols", Methods in Molecular Biology, (20130000), vol. 1031 | - "Mouse Models of Innate Immunity: Methods and Protocols", Methods in Molecular Biology, Springer Science + Business Media, LLC, (20130000), vol. 1031 | - TAUBECARLSTEN, "Action of dexamethasone in the suppression of delayed-type hypersensitivity in reconstituted SCID mice", Inflamm Res., (20000000), vol. 49, no. 10, pages 548 - 52 | - CONSTANTINESCU et al., "Experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis (EAE) as a model for multiple sclerosis (MS", Br J Pharmacol., (20111000), vol. 164, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01302.x, pages 1079 - 1106, XP055216575 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01302.x | - MANGALAM et al., "Two discreet subsets of CD8+ T cells modulate PLP - induced experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis in HLA-DR3 transgenic mice", J Autoimmun., (20120600), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 344 - 353 | - CAPLAZI et al., "Mouse models of rheumatoid arthritis", Veterinary Pathology, (20150901), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 819 - 826 | - BRAND et al., "Collagen-induced arthritis", Nature Protocols, (20070000), vol. 2, pages 1269 - 1275 | - PIETROSIMONE et al., "Collagen-induced arthritis: a model for murine autoimmune arthritis", Bio Protoc., (20151020), vol. 5, no. 20, page el626 | - TANEJA et al., J. Immunology, (20070000), vol. 56, pages 69 - 78 | - O TANEJA et al., J. Immunology, (20080000), vol. 181, pages 2869 - 2877 | - TANEJA et al., Arthritis Rheum., (20070000), vol. 56, pages 69 - 78 | - WOOLEY, J. Exp. Med., (19810000), vol. 154, pages 688 - 700 | - Arthritis Res Ther., (20120000), vol. 14, no. 6, page R237 | - RANDHAWA et al., "A review on chemical-induced inflammatory bowel disease models in rodents", Korean J Physiol Pharmacol., (20140000), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 279 - 288 | - CHASSAING et al., "Dextran sulfate sodium (DSS)-induced colitis in mice", Curr Protoc Immunol., (20140204), vol. 104 | - KIM et al., "Investigating intestinal inflammation in DSS-induced model of IBD", J Vis Exp., (20120000), vol. 60, page 3678 | - BELLE et al., "Mouse models for type 1 diabetes", Drug Discov Today Dis Models, (20090000), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ddmod.2009.03.008, pages 41 - 45, XP055045317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ddmod.2009.03.008 | - AILEEN JF KING, "The use of animal models in diabetes research", Br J Pharmacol., (20120600), vol. 166, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2012.01911.x, pages 877 - 894, XP055516274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2012.01911.x | - FICKERT et al., "Characterization of animal models for primary sclerosing cholangitis (PSC", J Hepatol., (20140606), vol. 0, no. 6, pages 1290 - 1303 | - POLLHEIMERFICKERT, "Animal models in primary biliary cirrhosis and primary sclerosing cholangitis", Clin Rev Allergy Immunol., (20150604), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 207 - 17 | - GEORGIEV et al., "Characterization of time-related changes after experimental bile duct ligation", Br J Surg., (20080000), vol. 95, no. 5, pages 646 - 56 | - FICKERT et al., "A new xenobiotic-induced mouse model of sclerosing cholangitis and biliary fibrosis", Am J Path., vol. 171, no. 2, pages 525 - 536 | - FICKERT et al., "Characterization of animal models for primary sclerosing cholangitis (PSC", J Hepatol., (20140000), vol. 60, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jhep.2014.02.006, pages 1290 - 1303, XP029020765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2014.02.006 | - IBRAHIM et al., "Animal models of nonalcoholic steatohepatitis: Eat, Delete, and Inflame", Dig Dis Sci., (20160506), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 1325 - 1336 | - LAU et al., Animal models of non-alcoholic fatty liver disease: current perspectives and recent advances, (20170124), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 36 - 44 | - KLEINER et al., "Design and validation of a histological scoring system for nonalcoholic fatty liver disease", Hepatology, (20050604), vol. 1, no. 6, doi:10.1002/hep.20701, pages 1313 - 1321, XP055123202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.20701 | - GUDJONSSON et al., "Mouse models of psoriasis", J Invest Derm., (20070000), vol. 127, doi:10.1038/sj.jid.5700807, pages 1292 - 1308, XP002692852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jid.5700807 | - VAN DER FITS et al., "Imiquimod-induced psoriasis-like skin inflammation in mice is mediated via the IL-23/IL-17 axis", J. Immunol., (20090501), vol. 182, no. 9, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.0802999, pages 5836 - 45, XP055376245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0802999 | - TSCHOP et al., "A guide to analysis of mouse energy metabolism", Nat. Methods, (20120000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 57 - 63 | - AYALA et al., "Standard operating procedures for describing and performing metabolic tests of glucose homeostasis in mice", Disease Models and Mechanisms, (20100000), vol. 3, pages 525 - 534 | - SU CHUL JANG et al., Small, (20170000), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 456 - 461 | - WIKLANDER et al., J. Extracellular Vesicles, (20150000), vol. 4, page 10 | - H-I. CHOI et al., Experimental & Molecular Medicine, (20170000), vol. 49, page e330 | - MILLER et al., Nanoscale, (20140507), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 4928 - 35 | - CVJETKOVIC et al., Sci. Rep., (20160000), vol. 6, page 36338 | - ERICKSON et al., Molecular Cell, (20170119), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 361 - 370 | - LIU et al., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (20100600), vol. 192, no. 11, pages 2852 - 2860 | - KIESELBACHOSCARSSON, Data Brief., (20170200), vol. 10, pages 426 - 431 | - ROBERTS et al., "Targeted Metabolomics", Curr Protoc Mol Biol., (20120000), vol. 30, pages 1 - 24 | - DETTMER et al., "Mass spectrometry-based metabolomics", Mass Spectrom Rev., (20070000), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1002/mas.20108, pages 51 - 78, XP002485404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mas.20108 | - A.J. MCBROOM et al., JBacteriol, vol. 188, pages 5385 - 5392 | - A. FRIAS et al., Microb Ecol., (20100000), vol. 59, pages 476 - 486 | - KIM et al., Nature Communications, (20170000), vol. 8, no. 626 | - TURJEMAN et al., PLoS One, vol. 10, no. 7, page e0130442 | - G. NORHEIM et al., PLoS ONE., vol. 10, no. 9, page e0134353 | - S. STUBBS et al., Letters in Applied Microbiology, (19990000), vol. 29, pages 31 - 36 | - Z. HOU, Scientific Reports, (20150000), vol. 5, no. 9570 | - TANEJA et al., Arthritis Rheum, (20070000), vol. 56, pages 69 - 78 | - FICKERT et al., "Characterization of animal models for primary sclerosing cholangitis (PSC", J Hepatol., (20140600), vol. 60, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.jhep.2014.02.006, pages 1290 - 1303, XP029020765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2014.02.006 | - POLLHEIMERFICKERT, "Animal models in primary biliary cirrhosis and primary sclerosing cholangitis", Clin Rev Allergy Immunol., (20150600), vol. 48, no. 2-3, pages 207 - 17 | - IBRAHIM et al., "Animal models of nonalcoholic steatohepatitis: Eat, Delete, and Inflame", Dig Dis Sci., (20160500), vol. 61, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s10620-015-3977-1, pages 1325 - 1336, XP035905925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10620-015-3977-1 | - TSCHOP et al., "A guide to analysis of mouse energy metabolism", Nat. Methods., (20120000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 57 - 63 | - KIESELBACHOSCARSSON, Data Brief, (20170200), vol. 10, pages 426 - 431 | - SOMANSCHI et al., J Vis Exp., (20110000), vol. 48, page 2540 | - SAARELA, J. Applied Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 99, pages 1330 - 1339 |