EP3921893 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC TRANSMISSION ATTENUATION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metawave Corporation 5993 Avenida Encinas Suite 101 Carlsbad - San Diego CA 92008 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEGERDICHIAN, Edmond Kia 5993 Avenida Encinas, Suite 101 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
MEGERDICHIAN, Edmond Kia Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20751969.5 | 04.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US16650 | Priority number, date | US201962801801P | 06.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962801801 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020163385 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921893 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/02, G01S7/40, G01S13/931, H01Q1/32, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/12 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3233 (EP,KR);
G01S13/87 (KR);
G01S7/027 (EP,KR,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/023 (KR);
G01S7/4013 (EP,KR);
G01S7/4043 (KR);
H01Q1/1271 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/22 (KR);
H01Q1/422 (EP,KR);
G01S2013/9327 (EP,KR);
G01S2013/93276 (EP,KR);
G01S7/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | H01Q1/22, G01S13/87, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR STEUERUNG DER DÄMPFUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2021/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC TRANSMISSION ATTENUATION CONTROL | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE COMMANDE D'ATTÉNUATION DE TRANSMISSION ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004227663 (SUZUKI MITSUSHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0039]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; figures 6,7 * [A] 4,6-10,13-15[I] 12; | [XAI]US2014354462 (SHI SHAWN [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0013]; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,13-15 [I] 12; | [XAI]US2017207513 (MIYOSHI AKITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0022] - [0028] - [0047]; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 6 [I] 12,14 | International search | [A]US6496138 (HONMA SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [Y]US2004227663 (SUZUKI MITSUSHIGE [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * , para [0008], [0011] *; | [Y]US2008136719 (KIM JEE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 8-9 * , para [0028]-[0029], [0038] *; | [A]US2009128393 (STJERNMAN ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US2010001897 (LYMAN NIALL R [US]) [X] 14-20 * , para [0012]-0015], [0018]-[0019] *; | [XY]US2014354462 (SHI SHAWN [US]) [X] 1-6, 10-13 * , para [0011]- [0015] * [Y] 7-9 | by applicant | US2004227663 | US2014354462 | US2017207513 |