EP3920961 - GROWTH HORMONE-RELEASING HORMONE ANTAGONISTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Government as represented by the Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | For all designated states University of Miami 1951 NW 7th Avenue Miami, FL 33136 / US | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Robert M. Miami Va Healthcare System 1201 NW 16th St. Miami, FL 33125 / US | 02 /
SCHALLY, Andrew, V. 3801 Collins Avenue, 1506 Miami Beach, FL 33140 / US | 03 /
CAI, Renzhi Miami VA Healthcare System 1201 Nw 16th St. Miami, FL 33125 / US | 04 /
CAI, Xianyang, Zhang 1200 Brickell Bay Drive 2109 Miami, FL 33131 / US | 05 /
WANG, Haibo 1441 NW 19th Street 127 Miami, FL 33135 / US | 06 /
SHA, Wei 1400 NW 10th Avenue 2009 Miami, FL 33136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
JACKSON, Robert M. Miami, FL 33125 / US | ||
02 /
SCHALLY, Andrew, V. Miami Beach, FL 33140 / US | |||
03 /
CAI, Renzhi Miami, FL 33125 / US | |||
04 /
CAI, Xianyang, Zhang Miami, FL 33131 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Haibo Miami, FL 33135 / US | |||
06 /
SHA, Wei Miami, FL 33136 / US | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20752274.9 | 08.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020US17375 | Priority number, date | US201962803170P | 08.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962803170 P | US201962869687P | 02.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962869687 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020163833 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3920961 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/25, C07K14/60, G01N33/74 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/60 (EP,US);
A61K38/25 (US);
A61P11/00 (US);
A61P35/00 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSHORMONFREISETZENDE HORMONANTAGONISTEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/50] | English: | GROWTH HORMONE-RELEASING HORMONE ANTAGONISTS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/50] | French: | ANTAGONISTES D'HORMONE DE LIBÉRATION D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004000883 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | International search | [XA]WO2009120831 (SCHALLY ANDREW VICTOR [US], et al); | [A]US2011066230 (SCHALLY ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US2018250358 (SCHALLY ANDREW [US], et al); |