EP3922967 - COLOR CONVERSION INFORMATION GENERATION METHOD, COLOR CONVERSION INFORMATION GENERATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASE Koichi c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD., 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
INAMURA Takashi c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD., 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA Takaya c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD., 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
TAKASE Koichi Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | ||
02 /
INAMURA Takashi Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA Takaya Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20752815.9 | 05.02.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020JP04248 | Priority number, date | JP20190019028 | 05.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019019028 | JP20190153871 | 26.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019153871 | [2021/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020162478 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922967 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, H04N1/60, H04N9/67, G01J3/52 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G01J3/52 (EP);
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G01J3/462 (EP);
G06T11/00 (EP);
H04N1/60 (US);
H04N23/85 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | G01J3/52, G06T1/00, H04N1/60, H04N9/07, H04N9/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | FARBUMWANDLUNGSINFORMATIONSERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON FARBKONVERSIONSINFORMATIONEN UND PROGRAMM | [2021/50] | English: | COLOR CONVERSION INFORMATION GENERATION METHOD, COLOR CONVERSION INFORMATION GENERATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CONVERSION DE COULEUR, SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CONVERSION DE COULEUR ET PROGRAMME | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | Translation filed | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006094137 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2006093770 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2017175568 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2009288928 | JP2019019028 | JP2019153871 |