EP4193501 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHARE, Saurabh Bangalore 560005 / IN | 02 /
KAHN, Colin Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 20753343.1 | 06.08.2020 | [2023/24] | WO2020EP72085 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028697 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193501 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L/ | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04L67/562 (EP);
H04L41/0246 (US);
H04L67/55 (EP);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W8/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2442597 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [X]US2016255165 (HAYASHI NARUKAZU [JP], et al); | [X]EP3592012 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]US2020174855 (ZHAO JUNJIE [CN], et al) |