EP4013736 - BRANCHED ALKANES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATTON, Serge 35 rue de la Grande Fontaine 78100 SAINT GERMAIN EN LAYE / FR | 02 /
LEMAIRE, Marc 32 rue Michel Dupeuble 69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | 03 /
MATHIS, Luc 30 rue Gambetta 94270 LE KREMLIN BICETRE / FR | 04 /
METAY, Estelle Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1 UMR 524 43 Bld du 11 Novembre 1918 Bt CPE/Curien - 3ème étage 69622 VILLEURBANNE / FR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20753965.1 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020EP72987 | Priority number, date | FR20190009242 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: FR 1909242 | FR20200003014 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2003014 | [2022/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032672 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013736 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/17, C07C31/125, C07C2/10, C07C2/30, C07C5/03, C07C9/22 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
C07C9/22 (EP,CN);
C07C5/03 (EP,CN,US);
C07C11/02 (CN);
C07C2/10 (EP,CN);
C07C2/30 (EP,US);
C07C6/04 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/10, C07C11/02 (EP,CN);
C07C2/30, C07C11/02 (EP);
C07C5/03, C07C9/22 (CN,EP);
C07C6/04, C07C11/02 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERZWEIGTE ALKANE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/25] | English: | BRANCHED ALKANES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME | [2022/25] | French: | ALCANES RAMIFIÉS ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 16.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5808115 (MAJETICH GEORGE F [US], et al) [X] 5,6 * Voir la table 5: trans-2,2-diméthylhept-3-ene *; | [X]WO2011083473 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION, et al) [X] 1-4 * Voir la page 15, ligne 2: 2,2-diméthyldecane *; | [X]WO2011139164 (SOLRAY ENERGY LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * Voir le composé 2,2-diméthylheptane;; claim 11 *; | [Y]CN102876350 (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN) [Y] 7-14* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2013160292 (UNIV AMSTERDAM [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,15 * Voir l'exemple 2, table dans la page 17: le mélange comprenant 2,2-diméthyloctane; page 1 * [Y] 7-14; | [X] - ALENA RANDOVÁ ET AL, "Group contribution method: Surface tension of linear and branched alkanes", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161201), vol. 429, doi:10.1016/j.fluid.2016.09.007, ISSN 0378-3812, pages 166 - 176, XP055725918 [X] 1-4 * Voir la table 2: 2,2-diméthyl-3-ethylpentane, 2,2-diméthylheptane, tc. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fluid.2016.09.007 | [X] - STEVEN H. BERTZ, "The preparation of hindered cuprates from aldehyde tosylhydrazones", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19800101), vol. 21, no. 33, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)77432-6, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3151 - 3154, XP055725927 [X] 1-4 * voir la table 2, entrée 2: 2,2,3-triméthylheptane * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)77432-6 | [X] - D. YU. NILOV ET AL, "Graphic model for calculating the entropy of C11N24 alkanes with allowance for multiple non-valence interactions through three atoms along the chain of a molecule", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY A, GB, (20160721), vol. 90, no. 8, doi:10.1134/S0036024416080203, ISSN 0036-0244, pages 1702 - 1705, XP055725929 [X] 1-4 * voir la table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0036024416080203 | [X] - ANDERS T. LINDHARDT ET AL, "Studies on the 1,2-Migrations in Pd-Catalyzed Negishi Couplings with JosiPhos Ligands", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, US, (20090102), vol. 74, no. 1, doi:10.1021/jo801824e, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 135 - 143, XP055725936 [X] 5,6 * Tables 4 et 5: mélanges d'oléfines ayant R=tBu * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo801824e | by applicant | WO2012052427 | WO2017085167 | WO2018206262 |