EP3993758 - SOLID COSMETIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPUIS, Lina 8 rue du Cheval Blanc 93694 PANTIN CEDEX / FR | 02 /
GIBERT, Cyril 8 rue du Cheval Blanc 93694 PANTIN CEDEX / FR | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20753982.6 | 03.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020FR51177 | Priority number, date | FR20190007389 | 03.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1907389 | [2022/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001637 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993758 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/36, A61K8/73, A61Q1/08, A61Q1/12, A61K8/92, A61K8/891 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/022 (EP,KR);
A61K8/922 (EP,CN);
A61K8/36 (US);
A61K8/0216 (CN,US);
A61K8/025 (EP,KR);
A61K8/0254 (EP,KR);
A61K8/0258 (EP,KR);
A61K8/19 (CN);
A61K8/25 (US);
A61K8/27 (CN,US);
A61K8/31 (KR);
A61K8/361 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K8/37 (CN);
A61K8/73 (CN);
A61K8/89 (CN);
A61K8/891 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61K8/987 (CN);
A61Q1/00 (KR);
A61Q1/04 (CN,KR);
A61Q1/08 (EP,CN);
A61Q1/10 (CN);
A61Q1/12 (EP,CN);
A61Q19/001 (US);
A61Q19/005 (US);
A61K2800/30 (CN,KR);
A61K2800/31 (CN,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | FESTE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/19] | English: | SOLID COSMETIC COMPOSITION | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE SOLIDE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 05.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]JPS6236309 (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [A]US4648908 (TAKASUKA YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [I]JP2002302415 (SHISEIDO CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2003040736 (NOEVIR KK); | [I]EP2626060 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [I]EP2928448 (ORÉAL L [FR]) | by applicant | FR2232303 | US5162410 | FR2679771 | US5236986 | US5412004 | EP0847752 | WO9838981 | US5811487 | US5837793 | US5874069 | US5919441 | US5981680 | US6051216 | FR2792190 | US6309629 | EP1184426 | WO2004073626 | US2004175338 | WO2006134282 | WO2007068371 | WO2008015505 | WO2008155059 | WO2009010356 |