EP3923983 - CHIMERIC RSV AND HMPV F PROTEINS, IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University Office of Technology Transfer 1599 Clifton Road, NE 4th Floor Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | For all designated states Children's Healthcare of Atlanta, Inc. 1600 Tullie Circle NE Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Martin L. 329 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
TODD, Sean 2015 Uppergate Drive Room 501 Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | 03 /
STOBART, Christopher C. 4600 Sunset Avenue Gallahue Hall 043 Indianapolis, Indiana 46208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
MOORE, Martin L. San Francisco, California 94080 / US | ||
02 /
TODD, Sean Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | |||
03 /
STOBART, Christopher C. Indianapolis, Indiana 46208 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20755020.3 | 11.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US17727 | Priority number, date | US201962804005P | 11.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962804005 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020167813 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923983 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C12N15/86, C12N15/79, A61K39/295 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,KR);
A61K39/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/12 (KR);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (KR);
C07K2319/40 (EP);
C12N2760/18322 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/18334 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/18522 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/18523 (EP);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,KR);
C12N2760/18543 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A61K39/12, C12N15/86, C12N15/79 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE RSV- UND HMPV-F-PROTEINE, IMMUNOGENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/51] | English: | CHIMERIC RSV AND HMPV F PROTEINS, IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS OF USE | [2021/51] | French: | PROTÉINES F CHIMÉRIQUES DE RSV ET HMPV, COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGÈNES, ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004241188 (COLLINS PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0107] , [0110] , [0111] , [0115] , [0118] , [0193] , [0201] , [0263]; sequence 1 * [I] 3,9; | [X]WO2017040387 (TECHNOVAX INC [US]) [X] 1-3* paragraphs [0018] , [0027] , [0073]; sequence 2 * | International search | [X]US2004241188 (COLLINS PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1, 4/1, 5/4/1, 11/1, 12/11/1, 15/1, 16/15/1 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0014], [0052], [0098], [0110], [0142], [0167], [0179], [0188], [0193] *; | [A]WO2005014626 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 11/1-3, 12/11/1-3, 15/1-3, 16/15/1-3* ; entire document *; | [X]WO2017040387 (TECHNOVAX INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * ; paragraphs [0018], [0027], [0073]; figure 1F * |