EP3924320 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holo, Inc. 39684 Eureka Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Holo, Inc. 2461 Peralta Street Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGWOOD, Leroy 39684 Eureka Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | 02 /
ADZIMA, Brian 39684 Eureka Drive Newark CA 94560 / US | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
MAGWOOD, Leroy Oakland, California 94607 / US | ||
02 /
ADZIMA, Brian Oakland, California 94607 / US | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20755173.0 | 10.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US17510 | Priority number, date | US201962803766P | 11.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962803766 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020167665 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924320 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/622, C04B35/634, B22F3/10, B22F10/12, B33Y10/00, B22F1/10, C04B35/626, C04B35/632, C04B35/636, C04B35/638 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C04B35/6264 (EP);
B22F10/12 (US);
B22F10/10 (EP);
B22F10/14 (US);
B22F10/28 (US);
B22F10/36 (US);
B22F3/1021 (EP,US);
B22F3/23 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/6267 (EP);
C04B35/6269 (EP);
C04B35/632 (EP);
C04B35/634 (EP);
C04B35/636 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C22C1/04 (EP);
C22C1/05 (EP);
B22F2203/11 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B33Y70/10 (US);
C04B2235/6026 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/10, B22F3/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | C04B35/622, C04B35/634 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR DREIDIMENSIONALES DRUCKEN | [2021/51] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL PRINTING | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2018057414 (OBRIEN MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11-15 * example 1; claims 1,17 * [Y] 6,7; | [XY]US2018133955 (GIBSON MICHAEL ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10,13-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0134] * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]WO2018151995 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 6,7* claim 10 *; | [XY]US2018304360 (FONTANA RICHARD REMO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-15 * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0171] * [Y] 6,7; | [A] - Dvornic Peter R, "High-Temperature-Stability-of-Polysiloxanes", silicon compounds: silanes and silicones 4000A, Morrisville PA, (20080101), pages 419 - 431, XP055970000 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5047181 (OCCHIONERO MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 7 * Abstract, col 5 In 58 - col 6 In 17; col 7 In 10-16. *; | [Y]US6117612 (HALLORAN JOHN W [US], et al) [Y] 10-11 * Abstract, col 3 In 44-51; col 4 In 21-25; Claim 1. *; | [A]US2004075197 (TANG HWA-HSING [TW]) [A] 1-19 * Entire Document. *; | [A]US2013307175 (TANG HWA-HSING [TW]) [A] 1-19* Entire Document. *; | [XY]US2016271878 (NUECHTERLEIN JACOB S [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 8-9, 12-19 * Abstract, para [0008], [0017]-[0020], [0029], [0035]-[0036], [0042], [0073]-[0075], [0086], [0088], Figure 1, Claim 8, Claim 28. * [Y] 6-7, 10-11; | [Y] - DECKERS et al., "Direct selective laser sintering/melting of high density alumina powder layers at elevated temperatures", Physics Procedia, (20140101), vol. 56, doi:10.1016/j.phpro.2014.08.154, pages 117 - 124, XP029053229 [Y] 6 * . Abstract, pg 117 para 1; pg 119 para 1; Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phpro.2014.08.154 | by applicant | US2018057414 | US2018133955 | US2018304360 |