EP3924778 - LARGE AREA HIGH RESOLUTION FEATURE REDUCTION LITHOGRAPHY TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHADHA, Arvinder c/o Applied Materials, Inc. Law Dept., M/S 1269 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
CHADHA, Arvinder Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20755271.2 | 24.01.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US14906 | Priority number, date | US201916276860 | 15.02.2019 Original published format: US201916276860 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020167446 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3924778 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/22, G03F1/52, G03F1/38, G02B5/18, G02B27/42, G03F7/20 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G03F7/70408 (EP,US);
G03F7/70316 (US);
G02B5/1866 (EP);
G03F7/213 (US);
G03F7/70275 (US);
G03F7/7035 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | G03F1/22, G03F1/52, G03F1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | GROSSFLÄCHIGES HOCHAUFLÖSENDES LITHOGRAFISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON MERKMALEN | [2021/51] | English: | LARGE AREA HIGH RESOLUTION FEATURE REDUCTION LITHOGRAPHY TECHNIQUE | [2021/51] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE LITHOGRAPHIE PAR RÉDUCTION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES HAUTE RÉSOLUTION DE GRANDE SURFACE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05217839 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 3-5 * paragraphs [0027] - [0044]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0060]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5703675 (HIRUKAWA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5 * column 13, line 19 - column 14, line 57; figure 1 *; | [XAYI]EP1852894 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * paragraphs [0071] - [0101]; figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0117] - [0120]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0162] - [0169] * * paragraph [0210] * * paragraphs [0234] - [0235] * [A] 11-15 [Y] 4 [I] 7; | [A]US2008258050 (MAKINOUCHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 11* paragraphs [0022] - [0054]; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY] - "New grating fabrication technology for optoelectronic devices:Cascaded self-induced holography", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (19951120), vol. 67, no. 21, doi:10.1063/1.114868, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3072 - 3074, XP012014083 [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * the whole document * [A] 9,11-15 [Y] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.114868 | International search | [A]US5413884 (KOCH THOMAS L [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [A]JPH11337713 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2006126053 (HINSBERG WILLIAM D III [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2007274633 (RAUB ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2008186579 (SOLAK HARUN H [CH]) [A] 1-15 | by applicant | EP1852894 | - C. H. LINZ. H. ZHUY. H. LO, "New grating fabrication technology for optoelectronic devices: Cascaded self-induced holography", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19951120), vol. 67, no. 21, pages 3072 - 3074 |