EP3923957 - COMBINED SPHERICAL NUCLEIC ACID AND CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR FOR ANTITUMOR THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exicure Operating Company 2430 N. Halsted Street, 4th Floor Chicago, IL 60614 / US | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Pinal 2430 N. Halsted Street 4th Floor Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | 02 /
DANIEL, Weston 2430 N. Halsted Street 4th Floor Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | 03 /
BEXON, Alice 177 Union St. Montclair, NJ 07042 / US | 04 /
SCHROFF, Matthias 2430 N. Halsted Street 4th Floor Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
PATEL, Pinal Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | ||
02 /
DANIEL, Weston Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | |||
03 /
BEXON, Alice Montclair, NJ 07042 / US | |||
04 /
SCHROFF, Matthias Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20756252.1 | 12.02.2020 | [2021/51] | WO2020US17999 | Priority number, date | US201962804748P | 12.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962804748 P | US201962946380P | 10.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962946380 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020168005 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923957 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7088, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61K31/711, A61K31/7125, A61K45/06, A61K39/00, C07K16/28 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU,US);
A61K31/7125 (EP,AU,US);
A61K31/711 (EP);
A61K39/39533 (EP,AU);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP,AU);
A61K2039/505 (EP,AU,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/711, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7125, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP);
A61K39/39533, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | A61K31/7088, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE SPHÄRISCHE NUKLEINSÄURE UND CHECKPOINT-INHIBITOR FÜR ANTITUMORTHERAPIE | [2021/51] | English: | COMBINED SPHERICAL NUCLEIC ACID AND CHECKPOINT INHIBITOR FOR ANTITUMOR THERAPY | [2021/51] | French: | ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE SPHÉRIQUE COMBINÉ ET INHIBITEUR DE POINT DE CONTRÔLE POUR UN TRAITEMENT ANTITUMORAL | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 04.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2022 | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO2015013673 (AURASENSE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document *; | [A]WO2015187966 (AURASENSE THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document *; | [A]WO2017193084 (EXICURE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document, Example 2, Fig. 20a especially. *; | [A]WO2017193081 (EXICURE INC [US]) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document, page 19 especially. *; | [A]WO2018067302 (NORTH WESTERN UNIV [US]) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document *; | [A]WO2018209270 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [A] 1-137 * Whole Document *; | [A] - JENSEN, S. A. et al., "Spherical Nucleic Acid Nanoparticle Conjugates as an RNAi- Based Therapy for Glioblastoma", Sci. Transl. Med, (20131030), vol. 5, no. 209, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3006839, XP055223158 [A] 1-137 * . Whole Document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3006839 | [A] - RADOVIC-MORENO, A.F. et al., "Immunomodulatory spherical nucleic acids", PNAS, (20150331), vol. 112, no. 13, doi:10.1073/pnas.1502850112, pages 3892 - 3897, XP055642206 [A] 1-137 * . Whole Document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1502850112 |